This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 21:29:57 (UTC).

MTR OF DONALD LEE BRAWLEY

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 MTR OF DONALD LEE BRAWLEY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0959

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TAMALA JANSEN

Decedent

DONALD LEE BRAWLEY

Not Classified By Court

SURTEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TREVOR D MARTIN

300 E State St Ste 200

Redlands, CA 92373

 

Court Documents

HRG OF 02/20/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/20/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/20/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/20/18 - PROBATE NOTES

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR, TAMALA JANSEN APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND 50,000.00, PATRICK WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR, TAMALA JANSEN APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND 50,000.00, PATRICK WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

HRG OF 01/23/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/23/18 - PROBATE NOTES

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY TAMALA JANSEN

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY TAMALA JANSEN

RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY TAMALA JANSEN

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY TAMALA JANSEN

PETITION RE: FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY DISCOVER BANK. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $7,189.13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • SELLERS FINAL CLOSING STATEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: PARTIAL NO. ILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • HEARING RE: RECEIPT OF BOND; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/23/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180228-0648 $25.50; 180228-0648-CK Reference Number 5790

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • CASE ADDED TO COURT SUPERVISION (PROBATE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • ON THE PETITION FOR WILL AND LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED 09/27/2017 OF TAMALA JANSEN, SURTEC INSURANCE COMPANY IS ADDED AS A BONDING COMPANY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • SURETY BOND ISSUED TAMALA JANSEN IN THE AMT OF $50,000.00 BY SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY TAMALA JANSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY TAMALA JANSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPTING EXECUTOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • ORIGINAL WILL LODGED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0521 $465.00; 170927-0521-CK Reference Number 17609

    Read MoreRead Less