This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 00:51:31 (UTC).

MTR OF DENNIS R MCDERMOTT

Case Summary

On 09/29/2016 MTR OF DENNIS R MCDERMOTT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0979

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ELIZABETH M SCHWANEBERG

Decedent

DENNIS R MCDERMOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KENNETH E DEVORE &ASSOCIATES

31355 Oak Crest Dr. Suite 250

Westlake Village, CA 91361

 

Court Documents

SUPPLEMENTAL (FIRST)TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LET TERS TESTAMENTARY FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL (FIRST)TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LET TERS TESTAMENTARY FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL (FIRST)TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LET TERS TESTAMENTARY FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL (FIRST)TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LET TERS TESTAMENTARY FILED. (IMAGED)

RECEIPT RE: DISTRIBUTION - PATRICIA SCHWANEBERG FILED.

RECEIPT RE: DISTRIBUTION - PATRICIA SCHWANEBERG FILED.

ORDER UPON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ETC FILED

ORDER UPON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ETC FILED

HRG OF 04/03/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/03/18 - PROBATE NOTES

SUPPLEMENTAL TO PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL TO PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION FILED. (IMAGED)

HRG OF 01/17/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/17/18 - PROBATE NOTES

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

ALLOWANCE OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM OF R.M. GALICIA INC DBA PROGRESSIVE MANAGEMENT SYSTMS IN THE AMOUNT OF $484.53 FILED.

ALLOWANCE OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM OF R.M. GALICIA INC DBA PROGRESSIVE MANAGEMENT SYSTMS IN THE AMOUNT OF $484.53 FILED.

ALLOWANCE OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM OF YOSEMITE INPATIENT SERVICES C/O DCM SERVICES IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,562.36 FILED.

ALLOWANCE OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM OF YOSEMITE INPATIENT SERVICES C/O DCM SERVICES IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,562.36 FILED.

NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CREDITORS FILED.

NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CREDITORS FILED.

NOTICE TO STATE AGENCIES OF DEATH FILED BY ELIZABETH M SCHWANEBERG.

NOTICE TO STATE AGENCIES OF DEATH FILED BY ELIZABETH M SCHWANEBERG.

LETTERS ISSUED ( TESTAMENTARY)

LETTERS ISSUED ( TESTAMENTARY)

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR, ELIZABETH M SCHWANEBERG APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQ, PATRICK B WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR, ELIZABETH M SCHWANEBERG APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQ, PATRICK B WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

HRG OF 12/05/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/05/16 - PROBATE NOTES

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PEITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PEITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY ELIZABETH M SCHWANEBERG

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY ELIZABETH M SCHWANEBERG

RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.; Minutes; ACTION - COMPLETE; CASE CLOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON EX-PARTE PET. FOR FINAL DISCHARGE & ORDER RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: DISTRIBUTION - PATRICIA SCHWANEBERG FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER UPON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ETC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • PETITION UPON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF ELIZABETH M SCHWANEBERG AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: SHANNON PRATT; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; STEPHANIE MANIS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ELIZABETH M SCHWANEBERG.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING APPROVED/GRANTED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE SET FOR 04/08/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 04/03/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 04/03/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • PETITION UPON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF ELIZABETH M SCHWANEBERG AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; CYNTHIA A LUDVIGSEN, JUDGE; CLERK: CHRISTINE SPENCER; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; BARBARA TAAFF APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ELIZABETH M SCHWANEBERG.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF THE COURT.; REASON: CLEAR PROBATE NOTES; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/03/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTMENT OF EXECUTOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS FILED BY ELIZABETH SCHWANEBERG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • ORIGINAL WILL LODGED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ELIZABETH M SCHWANEBERG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL & LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/ FULL AUTH TO ADMIN UNDER IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 161003-0435 $465.00; 161003-0435-CK Reference Number 6134

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.