This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 03:39:31 (UTC).

MTR OF DEE SHCNEPF-EWING

Case Summary

On 12/20/2016 MTR OF DEE SHCNEPF-EWING was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1249

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Respondents

ANGELA LANDIN

ABRAHAM TEKIN

OZEL DEVELOPERS, INC

Petitioner and Cross Plaintiff

ABRAHAM TEKIN

Decedent

DEE SHCNEPF-EWING

Minor

BO RAMOS

Other

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CARLONI, DIANA J

14390 Civic Drive, Suite B

Victorville, CA 92392

RICHARD M EWANISZYK

14350 Civic Drive Suite 100

Victorville, CA 92392

 

Court Documents

HRG OF 07/13/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 07/13/17 - PROBATE NOTES

WAIVER OF TIMELY NOTICE AND CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT FILED.

WAIVER OF TIMELY NOTICE AND CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT FILED.

NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CREDITORS FILED.

NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CREDITORS FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR, ANGELA LANDIN APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND $75,000.00, B.M GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR, ANGELA LANDIN APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND $75,000.00, B.M GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR ETC BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 07/12/18 AS TO C.O.R. FOR CHICAGO TITLE ESCROW, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR ETC BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 07/12/18 AS TO C.O.R. FOR CHICAGO TITLE ESCROW, FILED.

HRG OF 07/13/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 07/13/17 - PROBATE NOTES

WAIVER OF TIMELY NOTICE AND CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT FILED.

WAIVER OF TIMELY NOTICE AND CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT FILED.

NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CREDITORS FILED.

NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CREDITORS FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR, ANGELA LANDIN APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND $75,000.00, B.M GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR, ANGELA LANDIN APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND $75,000.00, B.M GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

COPY OF RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

COPY OF RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

HRG OF 05/11/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/11/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 07/02/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 07/02/18 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PET FOR SPECIFIC PERFORMANCE ETC FILED.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PET FOR SPECIFIC PERFORMANCE ETC FILED.

SURETY BOND ISSUED ANGELA LANDIN IN THE AMT OF 75,000 BY SURETEC FILED.

SURETY BOND ISSUED ANGELA LANDIN IN THE AMT OF 75,000 BY SURETEC FILED.

OBJECTION TO AND RESPONSE TO PET. FOR SPECIFIC PERFORMANCE ETC FILED BY ANGELA LANDIN

OBJECTION TO AND RESPONSE TO PET. FOR SPECIFIC PERFORMANCE ETC FILED BY ANGELA LANDIN

REJECTION OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM OF SYNCHRONY BANK FIN LUXURY FILED ON 01/10/2017 IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,068.26 FILED.

REJECTION OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM OF SYNCHRONY BANK FIN LUXURY FILED ON 01/10/2017 IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,068.26 FILED.

HRG OF 05/21/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/21/18 - PROBATE NOTES

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING THOMPSON & COLEGATE WITH RICHARD MEWANISZYK AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ABRAHAM TEKIN.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING THOMPSON & COLEGATE WITH RICHARD MEWANISZYK AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ABRAHAM TEKIN.

81 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2018
  • HEARING RE: STATUS/CONF OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • PETITION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF CREDITORS CLAIMS AND FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS OF SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • HEARING RE: PET FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF OR BREACH OF CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR SPECIFIC PERFORMANCE OR CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • PETITION FOR 1.FINANCIAL ABUSE OF A DEPENDENT ADULT 2.CONVERSIO N 3.COMMON COUNTS 4.CONSTRUCTIVE TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY WITHOUT ORDER IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): OZEL JEWELERS IS NOT A PARTY ON THE CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ABRAHAM TEKIN FOR FAX FILING SUB OF ATTY WITH POS; Minutes; Receipt: 180813-0391 $7.00; 180813-0391-VS Reference Number 0310136934693

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING THOMPSON & COLEGATE WITH RICHARD MEWANISZYK AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ABRAHAM TEKIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
122 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO THE FRANCHISE TAX BOARD TO FILE CLAIM FILED BY ANGELA LANDIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COPY OF RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ANGELA LANDIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF LODGING OF ORIGINAL WILL FILED BY ANGELA LANDIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON EXECUTOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL AUTHORIZATION TO ADMINISTER UNDER IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 161220-0043 $465.00; 161220-0043-CK Reference Number 1971

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.