This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 22:14:26 (UTC).

MTR OF DAVID HUERTA BARCENAS(Master File)

Case Summary

On 10/31/2017 MTR OF DAVID HUERTA BARCENAS Master File was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1090

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

JOSE NICHOLAS ESPINAL

RAMONA BARTENAS CASTANEDA

Decedent

DAVID HUERTA BARCENAS

Not Classified By Court

MONIQUE DIANA CASTANEDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

OPERINI, EDWARD G

16820 Ivy Avenue

Fontana, CA 92335

HORN, PAUL

11404 South Street

Cerritos, CA 90703

 

Court Documents

HRG OF 04/30/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/30/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/30/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/30/18 - PROBATE NOTES

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

HRG OF 04/30/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/30/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/23/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/23/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/30/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/30/18 - PROBATE NOTES

OBJECTION TO PETITION FILED BY JOSE NICHOLAS ESPINAL

OBJECTION TO PETITION FILED BY JOSE NICHOLAS ESPINAL

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY JOSE NICHOLAS ESPINAL.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY JOSE NICHOLAS ESPINAL.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY RAMONA BARTENAS CASTANEDA

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY RAMONA BARTENAS CASTANEDA

HRG OF 02/21/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/21/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/21/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/21/18 - PROBATE NOTES

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS FILED BY JOSE NICHOLAS ESPINAL

PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS FILED BY JOSE NICHOLAS ESPINAL

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY JOSE NICHOLAS ESPINAL

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY JOSE NICHOLAS ESPINAL

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL & FOR LTRS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL & FOR LTRS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

RECEIPT RE: FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT FILED.

RECEIPT RE: FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT FILED.

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY ACENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES LLC. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $799.60.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY ASCENSION RECOVERY SERVICES ,LLC. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $2,073.64.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED BY JOSE NICHOLAS ESPINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR PROBATE, LETTERS OF TESTAMENTARY WITH FULL AUTHORITY UNDER IAEA..; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: CHRISTINE SPENCER; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; RAMONA BARTENAS CASTANEDA PRESENT.; MONIQUE DIANA CASTANEDA PRESENT.; RAMONA BARTENAS CASTANEDA REQUESTS SPANISH INTERPRETER FOR SELF; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER CLAUDIA REVELO # 301552 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR RAMONA BARTENAS CASTANEDA. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); BOND REQUIRED $273,000.00; HEARINGS:; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/15/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S37P; INTERPRETER COORDINATOR NOTIFIED THAT SPANISH INTERPRETER IS NEEDED AT NEXT HEARING (SB CRIM/TRAF).; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • HRG OF 07/30/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • PARTY MONIQUE DIANA CASTANEDA UPDATED: PARTY ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PAUL HORN WITH PRO/PER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR MONIQUE DIANA CASTANEDA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • HRG OF 07/30/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DECLARATION OF ROGELIO HUERTA IN SUPPORT OF PET FOR PROBATE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS FILED BY JOSE NICHOLAS ESPINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY JOSE NICHOLAS ESPINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING EXECUTOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL & FOR LTRS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • ORIGINAL WILL LODGED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 171031-0672 $465.00; 171031-0672-CK Reference Number 5063

    Read MoreRead Less