This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 00:50:33 (UTC).

MTR OF DAVID DELEON

Case Summary

On 09/29/2016 MTR OF DAVID DELEON was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0978

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LAURA HARRISON

Decedent

DAVID DELEON

 

Court Documents

HRG OF 05/03/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/03/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/03/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/03/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SENT.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SENT.

HRG OF 02/16/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/16/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/16/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/16/17 - PROBATE NOTES

MAILING COVER SHEET RE: NOTICE (IMAGED)

MAILING COVER SHEET RE: NOTICE (IMAGED)

HRG OF 12/01/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/01/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/01/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/01/16 - PROBATE NOTES

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY LAURA HARRISON

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY LAURA HARRISON

WAIVER OF BOND BY HEIR OR BENEFICIARY FILED.

WAIVER OF BOND BY HEIR OR BENEFICIARY FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2017
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NON-APPEARANCE OF PETITIONER.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: PETITION DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 05/03/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 05/03/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE, THE COURT SET MATTER FOR AN OSC RE: DISMISSAL.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/03/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR 05/03/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 02/16/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 02/16/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MAILING COVER SHEET RE: NOTICE (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; GRACE DELEON PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); COMPETING PETITION OR WRITTEN OBJECTIONS TO BE FILED. MS. DELEON REPORTS A SPOUSAL PROPERTY; PETITION HAS BEEN GRANTED AND THERE IS NO OTHER ESTATE.; THE COURT WILL REQUIRE A BOND OF $185,900.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/16/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2016
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 161018-0826 $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON LETTERS OF ADMIN W/FULL IAEA BOND NOT REQUIRED RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY LAURA HARRISON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WAIVER OF BOND BY HEIR OR BENEFICIARY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: PROBATE LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 160929-0676 $465.00; 160929-0676-CK Reference Number 3006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.