This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 18:53:25 (UTC).

MTR OF DARR MADDOX

Case Summary

On 12/02/2016 MTR OF DARR MADDOX was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0354

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Conservator

MARK MADDOX

Conservatee

DARR MADDOX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Conservator Attorney

ENCARNACION, ESTEFAN M

Conservatee Attorney

DANIEL, JENNIFER M

220 Nordina St

Redlands, CA 92373

 

Court Documents

HRG OF 08/08/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 08/08/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 06/22/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 06/22/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/14/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/14/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE FILED.

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE FILED.

HRG OF 03/02/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/02/17 - PROBATE NOTES

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

HRG OF 05/16/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/16/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 10/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 10/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 011217 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 011217 FILED.

LETTERS ISSUED ( PERSON AND ESTATE)

LETTERS ISSUED ( PERSON AND ESTATE)

HRG OF 10/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 10/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

CITATION ISSUED. (IMAGED)

CITATION ISSUED. (IMAGED)

HRG OF 01/12/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/12/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/10/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/10/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/02/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/02/17 - PROBATE NOTES

ORDER APPOINTING CONSERVATOR FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING CONSERVATOR FILED.

EX PARTE APP FOR ORDR AUTH. COMPLETION OF CAPACITY DECL. FILED.

EX PARTE APP FOR ORDR AUTH. COMPLETION OF CAPACITY DECL. FILED.

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2018
  • CONSERVATORSHIP COMPLIANCE REVIEW HEARING ON PETITION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP FILED 12/02/2016 OF MARK MADDOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 09/19/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • CONSERVATORSHIP COMPLIANCE REVIEW HEARING ON PETITION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP FILED 12/02/2016 OF MARK MADDOX; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JUDGE PRO TEM WALTER MOORE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JENNIFER DANIEL PRESENT FOR DARR MADDOX.; PROCEEDINGS:; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; REVIEW HEARING HELD; MATTER IS CONTINUED.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/19/18 AT 09:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JUDGE PRO TEM WALTER MOORE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JENNIFER DANIEL PRESENT FOR DARR MADDOX.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; MATTER IS CONTINUED.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/19/18 AT 09:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY ATTORNEY JENNIFER DANIEL.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 08/08/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 08/08/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • CONFIDENTIAL GENERAL CARE PLAN OF CONSERVATEE FILED BY MARK MADDOX. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DETERMINATION OF CONSERVATEE'S APPROPRIATE LEVEL OF CARE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • CONSERVATORSHIP COMPLIANCE REVIEW HEARING ON PETITION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP FILED 12/02/2016 OF MARK MADDOX; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT GARY TREADWAY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JENNIFER DANIEL PRESENT FOR DARR MADDOX.; MARK MADDOX PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; MATTER IS CONTINUED. ATTORNEY JENNIFER DANIEL TO TRY TO ASSIST THE CONSERVATOR WITH FILING THE; REQUIRED DOCUMENTS.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/08/18 AT 09:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES OF CONSERVATOR AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF HANDBOOK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL GENERAL CARE PLAN OF CONSERVATEE FILED BY MARK MADDOX. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • LIST OF REQUIRED CONTACT INFORMATION FOR CONSERVATORSHIPS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • PROBATE INVESTIGATORS' REFERRAL REPORT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTIFICATION TO COURT OF ADDRESS OF CONSERVATORSHIP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (CONSERVATORSHIP); Minutes; Receipt: 161202-0220 $465.00; 161202-0220-VS Reference Number 031-0002855317

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.