This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 21:43:02 (UTC).

MTR OF DANIEL S LUNA SR

Case Summary

On 10/05/2017 MTR OF DANIEL S LUNA SR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1003

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ANDREW M LUNA

Decedent

DANIEL S LUNA SR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

AARON F GARCIA

71-780 San Jacinto Drive Building J

Rancho Mirage, CA 92270

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CALIFORNIA VICTIM ETC FILED BY ANDREW M LUNA.

NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CALIFORNIA VICTIM ETC FILED BY ANDREW M LUNA.

NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO DEPT. OF HEALTH CARE SRVCS FILED BY ANDREW M LUNA.

NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO DEPT. OF HEALTH CARE SRVCS FILED BY ANDREW M LUNA.

NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO FRANCHISE TAX BOARD FILED BY ANDREW M LUNA.

NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO FRANCHISE TAX BOARD FILED BY ANDREW M LUNA.

NOTICE OF 1/25/18 MINUTE ORDER CORRECTING FUTURE HEARING (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF 1/25/18 MINUTE ORDER CORRECTING FUTURE HEARING (IMAGED)

LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATION)

LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATION)

LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATION)

LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATION)

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, ANDREW M LUNA APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, B.M. GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, ANDREW M LUNA APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, B.M. GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

HRG OF 01/25/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/25/18 - PROBATE NOTES

WAIVER OF BOND BY HEIR OR BENEFICIARY/DANIEL B LUNA FILED.

WAIVER OF BOND BY HEIR OR BENEFICIARY/DANIEL B LUNA FILED.

WAIVER OF BOND BY HEIR OR BENEFICIARY/ARTHUR M LUNA FILED.

WAIVER OF BOND BY HEIR OR BENEFICIARY/ARTHUR M LUNA FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

HRG OF 01/25/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/25/18 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY ANDREW M LUNA

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY ANDREW M LUNA

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ANDREW M LUNA

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ANDREW M LUNA

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION RE: FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180827-0239 $26.50; 180827-0239-VS Reference Number 033-0083637258

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • ORDER APPROVING WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING AND FIRST AND FINAL REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND FIRST AND FINAL REPORT ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF ANDREW M LUNA AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER CHERYL ORTEGA 13709; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY AARON GARCIA PRESENT FOR ANDREW LUNA.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); WAIVER OF AND FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING APPROVED/GRANTED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE SET FOR 08/22/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • HRG OF 08/09/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF DECLARATION ADDRESSING PROBATE EXAMINERSS NOTES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ANDREW M LUNA FOR FAX/ENV/POST/COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 180802-0278 $6.21; 180802-0278-VS Reference Number 031-0133874085

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DECLARATION OF ADDRESSING PROBATE EXAMINERS NOTES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • HRG OF 08/09/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ANDREW M LUNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPTING EXECUTOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • ** VOID ** PROBATE >1.5M <2M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ANDREW M LUNA FOR PTN FOR LETTERS OF ADMIN; Minutes; Receipt: 171005-0391 $465.00; 171005-0391-MC Reference Number 031-0049004244

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 171005-0387 $1,996.50; 171005-0387-MC Reference Number 031-0049004244

    Read MoreRead Less