This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 00:36:41 (UTC).

MTR OF CYRIL SR BOZONIER

Case Summary

On 09/26/2016 MTR OF CYRIL SR BOZONIER was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0963

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

CYRIL JR BOZONIER

CYRIL BOZONIER jr

Decedent

CYRIL SR BOZONIER

 

Court Documents

HRG OF 05/22/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/22/17 - PROBATE NOTES

MAILING COVER SHEET RE: 04/17/17 MINUTE ORDER (IMAGED)

MAILING COVER SHEET RE: 04/17/17 MINUTE ORDER (IMAGED)

HRG OF 04/17/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/17/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/17/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/17/17 - PROBATE NOTES

WAIVER OF ACCOUNT BY CYRIL BOZONIER JR FILED.

WAIVER OF ACCOUNT BY CYRIL BOZONIER JR FILED.

PETITION FOR TERMINATION OF PROCEEDING AND DISCHARGE OF PER FILED BY CYRIL JR. BOZONIER(PROBATE).

PETITION FOR TERMINATION OF PROCEEDING AND DISCHARGE OF PER FILED BY CYRIL JR. BOZONIER(PROBATE).

DECLARATION OF PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED

DECLARATION OF PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED

LETTERS ISSUED ( OF ADMINISTRATION)

LETTERS ISSUED ( OF ADMINISTRATION)

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, CYRIL JR BOZONIER APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQ, B M GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, CYRIL JR BOZONIER APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQ, B M GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

HRG OF 11/09/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/09/16 - PROBATE NOTES

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

HRG OF 11/09/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/09/16 - PROBATE NOTES

LETTERS ISSUED ( SPECIAL)

LETTERS ISSUED ( SPECIAL)

ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR, CYRIL JR. BOZONIER APPOINTED WITH --- IAEA. BOND NOT REQ, --- APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR, CYRIL JR. BOZONIER APPOINTED WITH --- IAEA. BOND NOT REQ, --- APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY CYRIL JR BOZONIER

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY CYRIL JR BOZONIER

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY CYRIL JR BOZONIER

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY CYRIL JR BOZONIER

PETITION LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION WIH GENERAL FILED BY POWERS WITH FULL AUTH TO ADMIN UNDER IAEA(PROBATE).

PETITION LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION WIH GENERAL FILED BY POWERS WITH FULL AUTH TO ADMIN UNDER IAEA(PROBATE).

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL AUTHORIZATION TO ADMINISTER UNDER IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL AUTHORIZATION TO ADMINISTER UNDER IAEA FILED.

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TERMINATING PROCEEDINGS AND DISCHARGING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • PETITION FOR TERMINATION OF PROCEEDINGS ETC; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER LINDY CASTRO 13180; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; BERL SELKSI SPECIALLY APPEARS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR CYRIL JR BOZONIER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); COURT GRANTS PETITION TO TERMINATE ESTATE AS A NO ASSET ESTATE AND COURT APPROVES THE WAIVER OF THE; ACCOUNT (THAT WAS FILED FEBRUARY 17, 2017).; COURT VACATES ACCOUNTING REVIEW SET FOR 1/11/18; COURT VACATES OSC AS ESTATE IS TERMINATED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; VACATE PRARV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/11/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/22/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • HEARING RE: OSC RE TERMINATION OF ESTATE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 05/22/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 05/22/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MAILING COVER SHEET RE: 04/17/17 MINUTE ORDER (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • PETITION FOR TERMINATION OF PROCEEDINGS ETC; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER LINDY CASTRO 13180; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); COURT CONTINUES THIS HEARING TO MAY 22, 2017 AND THE COURT SETS OSC RE TERMINATION OF THE ESTATE; FOR THE SAME DATE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/22/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; HEARING RE: OSC RE TERMINATION OF ESTATE SET FOR 05/22/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 04/17/17 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 04/17/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 04/17/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY CYRIL JR BOZONIER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION WIH GENERAL FILED BY POWERS WITH FULL AUTH TO ADMIN UNDER IAEA(PROBATE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL AUTHORIZATION TO ADMINISTER UNDER IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 160926-0418 $930.00; 160926-0418-VS Reference Number 023-0270667488

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.