This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 16:32:30 (UTC).

MTR OF CHARLES KNIGHT

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 MTR OF CHARLES KNIGHT was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0359

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner, Not Classified By Court and Conservator

ARTINA MCINTOSH

Conservatee

CHARLES KNIGHT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner, Not Classified By Court and Conservator Attorney

GARY, KARL L

395 S Los Robles Ave #24

Pasadena, CA 91101

Conservatee Attorney

MOORE, WALTER T.

7820 Boulder Avenue

Highland, CA 92346

 

Court Documents

ORDER (EX PARTE) RE COMPLETITION OF CAPACITY DECLARATION HIPAA FILED

ORDER (EX PARTE) RE COMPLETITION OF CAPACITY DECLARATION HIPAA FILED

HRG OF 03/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY WALTER MOORE TO REPRESENT CHARLES KNIGHT FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY WALTER MOORE TO REPRESENT CHARLES KNIGHT FILED.

HRG OF 12/21/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/21/17 - PROBATE NOTES

COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION OF CONSERVATOR EDUCATION COURSE OF ARTINA MCINTOSH PLACED IN FILE. (IMAGED)

COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION OF CONSERVATOR EDUCATION COURSE OF ARTINA MCINTOSH PLACED IN FILE. (IMAGED)

HRG OF 12/21/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/21/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 12/21/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 12/21/17 FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING COURT INVESTIGATOR FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING COURT INVESTIGATOR FILED.

LETTERS OF TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR OF PERSON AND ESTATE ISSUED

LETTERS OF TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR OF PERSON AND ESTATE ISSUED

ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR, SIGNED BY JUDGE TARA REILLY FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR, SIGNED BY JUDGE TARA REILLY FILED.

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR FILED BY ARTINA MCINTOSH

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR FILED BY ARTINA MCINTOSH

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE FILED.

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COURT INVESTIGATOR'S REFERRAL REPORT FILED.

COURT INVESTIGATOR'S REFERRAL REPORT FILED.

NOTIFICATION TO COURT OF ADDRESS OF CONSERVATORSHIP FILED

NOTIFICATION TO COURT OF ADDRESS OF CONSERVATORSHIP FILED

DUTIES OF CONSERVATOR AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF HANDBOOK FILED.

DUTIES OF CONSERVATOR AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF HANDBOOK FILED.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • CONSERVATORSHIP INVESTIGATOR REVIEW RE: CI ANNUAL REVIEW DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH KARL L GARY AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ARTINA MCINTOSH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY WALTER MOORE PRESENT FOR CHARLES KNIGHT.; KARL GARY APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ARTINA MCINTOSH.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: FOR CONSERVATEE TO BE TAKEN TO DOCTOR TO OBTAIN; A CAPACITY DECLARATION/TO CLEAR PROBATE NOTES; KARL GARY IS TO FILE A SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY WITH THE COURT.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/11/18 AT 09:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • HRG OF 06/21/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • HRG OF 06/21/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER (EX PARTE) RE COMPLETITION OF CAPACITY DECLARATION HIPAA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ARTINA MCINTOSH FOR CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER; Minutes; Receipt: 180322-0332 $26.00; 180322-0332-DB Reference Number 031-0096877879

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING COMPLETION OF CAPACITY DECLARATION - HIPAA FILED BY ARTINA MCINTOSH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: SHANNON PRATT; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY WALTER MOORE PRESENT FOR CHARLES KNIGHT.; ATTORNEY KARL GARY PRESENT FOR ARTINA MCINTOSH.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); THE COURT FINDS THE ADDRESS OF CHARLES KNIGHT ON THE NOTIFICATION OF CONSERVATORSHIP ADDRESS IS; SUFFICIENT.; THE COURT FURTHER FINDS THAT "PHILLIP" AND"JOHN" ARE THE SAME PERSON.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COURT.; REASON: TO CLEAR PROBATE NOTES.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/21/18 AT 09:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTMENT OF COURT INVESTIGATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ARTINA MCINTOSH FOR PET FOR TEMP CONSERVATORSHIP; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0166 $90.00; 171004-0166-CK Reference Number 2693

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • LIST OF REQUIRED CONTACT INFORMATION FOR CONSERVATORSHIPS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT INVESTIGATOR'S REFERRAL REPORT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTIFICATION TO COURT OF ADDRESS OF CONSERVATORSHIP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES OF CONSERVATOR AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF HANDBOOK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (CONSERVATORSHIP); Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0154 $465.00; 171004-0154-CK Reference Number 2693

    Read MoreRead Less