This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 01:49:47 (UTC).

MTR OF CARRIE JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 10/26/2016 MTR OF CARRIE JOHNSON was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1079

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR

San Bernardino, CA 92415

Decedent

CARRIE JOHNSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

C/O PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR

175 South Lena Rd

San Bernardino, CA 92415

 

Court Documents

HRG OF 05/08/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/08/18 - PROBATE NOTES

ORDER ON STATEMENT OF PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR - DISCHARGE FILED

ORDER ON STATEMENT OF PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR - DISCHARGE FILED

STATEMENT OF THE PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR FILED.

STATEMENT OF THE PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR FILED.

STATEMENT OF THE PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR FILED.

STATEMENT OF THE PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR FILED.

HRG OF 01/16/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/16/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/16/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/16/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/16/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/16/18 - PROBATE NOTES

AMENDED NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION FILED.

AMENDED NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION FILED.

NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION

NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION

ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR TO COLLECT AND SELL THE PROPERTY OF DECEDENT FILED

ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR TO COLLECT AND SELL THE PROPERTY OF DECEDENT FILED

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF SALE OF REAL PROP 09/26,27/16 10/03/16 FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF SALE OF REAL PROP 09/26,27/16 10/03/16 FILED.

APPLICATION OF THE PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR FOR AUTHORITY TO SUMMARILY DISPOSE OF ESTATE FILED.

APPLICATION OF THE PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR FOR AUTHORITY TO SUMMARILY DISPOSE OF ESTATE FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • VACATE PRARV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/08/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 05/08/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON STATEMENT OF PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR - DISCHARGE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF THE PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON ORDER ON STATEMENT OF PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER LINDY CASTRO 13180; COURT ATTENDANT GARY TREADWAY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY CRAIG PARKER PRESENT FOR PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/08/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 01/16/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 01/16/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170623-0649 $205.00; 170623-0649-CK Reference Number 3610048346

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR TO COLLECT AND SELL THE PROPERTY OF DECEDENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF SALE OF REAL PROP 09/26,27/16 10/03/16 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION OF THE PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR FOR AUTHORITY TO SUMMARILY DISPOSE OF ESTATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR ARE WAIVED FOR APP OF THE PA IN THE AMOUNT OF $205.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • SET DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON AUTHORIZING THE P.A. TO COLLECT & SELL RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.