This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 16:34:43 (UTC).

MTR OF BRITNY CLEVENGER

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 MTR OF BRITNY CLEVENGER was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0360

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Conservator

RACHEL WATSON

Conservatee

BRITNY CLEVENGER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservatee Attorney

LATOURETTE, JANET

300 E. State Street Ste 300

Redlands, CA 92373

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • CONSERVATORSHIP INVESTIGATOR REVIEW RE: CI ANNUAL REVIEW DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • CONSERVATORSHIP COMPLIANCE REVIEW HEARING ON PETITION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP FILED 10/04/2017 OF RACHEL WATSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • HRG OF 09/12/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • CONFIDENTIAL GENERAL CARE PLAN OF CONSERVATEE FILED BY RACHEL WATSON. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DETERMINATION OF CONSERVATEE'S APPROPRIATE LEVEL OF CARE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONSERVATEE'S RIGHTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • HRG OF 09/12/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • CASE ADDED TO COURT SUPERVISION (PROBATE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • LETTERS ISSUED ( LIMITED CONSERVATORSHIP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • ORDER APPOINTING LIMITED CONSERVATOR, RACHEL WATSON APPOINTED WITH - IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, --- APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2017
  • LIST OF REQUIRED CONTACT INFORMATION FOR CONSERVATORSHIPS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PROBATE INVESTIGATORS' REFERRAL REPORT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING TEMP CNSVTRSHIP RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR FILED BY RACHEL WATSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING CNSVTR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (CONSERVATORSHIP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less