This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 01:00:30 (UTC).

MTR OF ANTONIO F FRIAS

Case Summary

On 10/04/2016 MTR OF ANTONIO F FRIAS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0988

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SILVIA FRIAS

Decedent

ANTONIO F FRIAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN R RAMOS

2509 West Beverly Blvd

Montebello, CA 90640

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTLING FINAL ACCOUNTING AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR FILED.

ORDER SETTLING FINAL ACCOUNTING AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR FILED.

ORDER SETTLING FINAL ACCOUNTING AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR FILED.

ORDER SETTLING FINAL ACCOUNTING AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR FILED.

HRG OF 04/25/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/25/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/25/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/25/18 - PROBATE NOTES

CONSENT TO NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION BY ERICA FRIAS FILED.

CONSENT TO NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION BY ERICA FRIAS FILED.

CONSENT TO NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION BY ERICA FRIAS FILED.

CONSENT TO NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION BY ERICA FRIAS FILED.

HRG OF 07/24/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 07/24/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 07/24/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 07/24/17 - PROBATE NOTES

RECEIPT FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION RECEIVED FROM SILVIA FRIAS FILED.

RECEIPT FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION RECEIVED FROM SILVIA FRIAS FILED.

CORRECTION OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED.

CORRECTION OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED.

FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY SILVIA FRIAS

FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY SILVIA FRIAS

HRG OF 02/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

CONSENT TO NTC OF PROPOSED ACTION FILED.

CONSENT TO NTC OF PROPOSED ACTION FILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

LETTERS ISSUED ( EXECUTOR- SILVIA FRIAS)

LETTERS ISSUED ( EXECUTOR- SILVIA FRIAS)

HRG OF 12/07/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/07/16 - PROBATE NOTES

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINSITER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINSITER ESTATE FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY SILVIA FRIAS

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY SILVIA FRIAS

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2019
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION RECEIVED FROM REBECCA JENNIFER AGUILAR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION RECEIVED FROM ERICA ANN FRIAS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: STATUTORY COMMISSION TO EXECUTOR SILVIA FRIAS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION RECEIVED FROM SILVIA FRIAS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: EXTRAORDINARY ATTORNEY FEES FOR JOHN RAMOS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: STATUTORY ATTY FEES - JOHN RAMOS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SILVIA FRIAS FOR FAX FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 180709-1002 $7.00; 180709-1002-VS Reference Number 031-0129220061

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTLING FINAL ACCOUNTING AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON SETTLING FINAL ACCOUNT, ATTORNEY FEES ETC RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY SILVIA FRIAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY SILVIA FRIAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY SILVIA FRIAS IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON SILVIA FRIAS FOR PET FOR PROBATE OF WILL & FOR LTRS TESTAMENTARY IN THE AMOUNT OF $465.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL & FOR LTRS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING EXECUTOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.