This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 01:36:40 (UTC).

MTR OF AMELIA E SMITH

Case Summary

On 10/18/2016 MTR OF AMELIA E SMITH was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1056

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NATALIE BECK FRIERSON

Decedent

AMELIA E SMITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MYERS & D'ANGELO

301 N Lake Ave Suite 130

Pasadena, CA 91101

 

Court Documents

ORDER ACCOUNTING REVIEW STATUS AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING FILED

ORDER ACCOUNTING REVIEW STATUS AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING FILED

ORDER ACCOUNTING REVIEW STATUS AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING FILED

ORDER ACCOUNTING REVIEW STATUS AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING FILED

HRG OF 04/23/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/23/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/23/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/23/18 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 042318 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 042318 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 042318 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 042318 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 040518 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 040518 FILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: PARTIAL NO. ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: PARTIAL NO. ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: PARTIAL NO. ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: PARTIAL NO. ILED.

STATUS REPORT RE: ACCOUNTING REVIEW STATUS & REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED BY NATALIE BECK FRIERSON

STATUS REPORT RE: ACCOUNTING REVIEW STATUS & REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED BY NATALIE BECK FRIERSON

HRG OF 04/05/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/05/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

LETTER FROM SEAN FIELDING SMITH PLACED IN FILE

LETTER FROM SEAN FIELDING SMITH PLACED IN FILE

HRG OF 12/15/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/15/16 - PROBATE NOTES

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY CAPITAL ONE. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $19,225.84.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY CAPITAL ONE. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $19,225.84.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL FOR LETTERS OF TEST W/ FULL AUTH IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL FOR LETTERS OF TEST W/ FULL AUTH IAEA FILED.

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ACCOUNTING REVIEW STATUS AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • PROBATE STATUS REPORT FILED.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY R CHANDLER MYERS PRESENT FOR NATALIE FRIERSON.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; STATUS REPORT APPROVED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; ACCOUNTING REVIEW SET FOR 01/14/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CREDITORS CLAIM FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • HRG OF 04/23/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 04/23/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 04/05/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON ACCOUNTING REVIEW STATUS AND REQUEST ETC RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 042318 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • ORIGINAL WILL LODGED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON PROBATE OF WILL & LETTERS OF TEST W/ FULL IAEA RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL FOR LETTERS OF TEST W/ FULL AUTH IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY NATALIE BECK FRIERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 161021-0226 $465.00; 161021-0226-CK Reference Number 14115

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.