This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 16:36:41 (UTC).

MTR OF ALONDRA MEDINA

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 MTR OF ALONDRA MEDINA was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0362

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Conservator

CLAUDIA GARCIA

Conservatee

ALONDRA MEDINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2019
  • CONSERVATORSHIP INVESTIGATOR REVIEW RE: CI ANNUAL REVIEW DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • CONSERVATORSHIP COMPLIANCE REVIEW HEARING ON PETITION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP FILED 10/04/2017 OF CLAUDIA GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONSERVATEE'S RIGHTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • CONSERVATORSHIP COMPLIANCE REVIEW HEARING ON PETITION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP FILED 10/04/2017 OF CLAUDIA GARCIA; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY J DAVID HORSPOOL PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; MATTER IS CONTINUED. ATTORNEY HORSPOOL TO ASSIST THE CONSERVATOR WITH FILING THE REQUIRED; DOCUMENTS.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/07/18 AT 09:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 09/05/18 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • HRG OF 09/05/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • HRG OF 09/05/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ALONDRA MEDINA FOR 2 CC LETTERS IN THE AMOUNT OF $53.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • LETTERS ISSUED ( LIMITED CONSERVATORSHIP OF THE PERSON)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • CASE ADDED TO COURT SUPERVISION (PROBATE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • ORDER APPOINTING LIMITED CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON, CLAUDIA GARCIA APPOINTED WITH NO IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, NONE APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ALONDRA MEDINA IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ALONDRA MEDINA FOR PETITION IN THE AMOUNT OF $465.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINT COURT INVESTIGATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINT CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON-LIMITED RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DUTIES OF CONSERVATOR AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF HANDBOOK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (CONSERVATORSHIP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON (LIMITED) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less