This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 21:29:47 (UTC).

MTR OF AARON BRODAHL

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 MTR OF AARON BRODAHL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0958

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CRESTIN AARA

Decedent

AARON BRODAHL

Minor

MINOR CHILDREN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 03/27/18 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 03/27/18 FILED.

HRG OF 03/27/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/27/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/27/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/27/18 - PROBATE NOTES

SUPPLEMENTAL SPOUSAL PROPERTY PET FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL SPOUSAL PROPERTY PET FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED. (IMAGED)

HRG OF 01/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

SPOUSAL/DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY PETITION FILED.

SPOUSAL/DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY PETITION FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2018
  • SPOUSAL OR DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION HEARING.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: CHRISTINE SPENCER; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF CRESTIN AARA PRESENT; ATTORNEY SHERRI KASTILAHN (GAL) PRESENT FOR MINOR CHILDREN.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED 09/27/2017 OF CRESTIN AARA IS GRANTED; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED 09/27/2017 OF CRESTIN AARA ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • HRG OF 07/03/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION HEARING.; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY SHERRI KASTILAHN MAKES A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE; CRESTIN AARA PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COURT.; REASON: TO REVIEW RECENTLY FILED SUPPLEMENT; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/03/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY MS. KASTILAHN.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DECLARATION OF CRESTIN BRODAHL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • HRG OF 06/19/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • HRG OF 06/19/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 03/27/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION HEARING.; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: SHANNON PRATT; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY SHERRI KASTILAHN APPEARS BY COURT CALL.; CRESTIN AARA (AKA CRESTIN BROADAHL) PRESENT IN PRO PER.; PROCEEDINGS:; ORAL REPORT GIVEN BY SHERRI KASTILAHN.; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); MATTER IS CONTINUED.; PETITIONER IS TO FILE A VERIFIED DECLARATION TO DETAIL THE SOURCE OF THE DOWN PAYMENT ON THE; PROPERTY, HOW THE PAYMENTS ON THE PROPERTY WERE MADE, AND IF HER NAME WAS ON ANY OF THE LOANS.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/19/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 03/27/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2018
  • ON SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED 09/27/2017 OF CRESTIN AARA FOR MINOR CHILDREN ADD SHERRI KASTILAHN AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • ON THE SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED 09/27/2017 OF CRESTIN AARA, MINOR CHILDREN IS ADDED AS A MINORS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION HEARING.; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; CYNTHIA A LUDVIGSEN, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ; APPEARANCES:; CRESTIN BRODAHL PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COURT.; REASON: TO CLEAR PROBATE NOTES; THE COURT ORDERS SUPPLMENT BE FILED CORRECTING PETITIONERS NAME TO BE CRESTIN BRODAHL.; THE COURT APPOINTS SHERRI KASTILAHN AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR THE MINOR CHILDREN.; CLERK'S OFFICE TO PROVIDE COPY OF FILE TO GAL; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 03/27/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTES OF 1/22/18 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 01/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 01/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SPOUSAL/DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY PETITION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0325 $465.00; 170927-0325-VS Reference Number 095013

    Read MoreRead Less