This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/08/2021 at 11:58:26 (UTC).

Mt. Slover Mobile Home Park, LLC -v-

Case Summary

On 12/11/2020 Mt Slover Mobile Home Park, LLC -v- was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Williams, David A and Robinson, Jay H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8899

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Williams, David A

Robinson, Jay H

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mt. Slover Mobile Home Park, LLC

Respondent

Potts, Roger

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Mihelich, Michael William

 

Court Documents

Petition Filed (Civil)

12/11/2020: Petition Filed (Civil)

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

12/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Notice of Required Documents

12/11/2020: Notice of Required Documents

Notice of Hearing Sent

12/11/2020: Notice of Hearing Sent

**CV - Portal Minute Order

03/22/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Status Hearing on Petition

03/22/2021: Status Hearing on Petition

Notice Returning Documents

06/21/2021: Notice Returning Documents

**CV - Portal Minute Order

07/02/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Order to Show Cause - Predisposition

07/02/2021: Order to Show Cause - Predisposition

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jay H; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Status of Amended Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:; Comment: 7/2/2021 minute order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketRemote hearing held; Comment: pursuant to Judicial Council Emergency Rule of Court 3(a)(3).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jay H; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: status of default judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: Court Judgment Packet; Per judicial review, The petition does not seek any monetary damages. Judgment was not entered.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketRemote hearing held; Comment: pursuant to Judicial Council Emergency Rule of Court 3(a)(3).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Hearing on Petition; Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jay H; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • FinancialMt. Slover Mobile Home Park, LLC; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-03117; Mt. Slover Mobile Home Park, LLC; $240.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • FinancialMt. Slover Mobile Home Park, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • FinancialMt. Slover Mobile Home Park, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: $240.00; Total Payments and Credits: $240.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNo Summons Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $240.00 check paid 01.20.21 for first appearance fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Sent re:; Comment: COA is missing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNo Summons Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Filed (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less