This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 14:11:37 (UTC).

MOUNTAIN VIEW -V- DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES

Case Summary

On 01/20/2015 MOUNTAIN VIEW filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0804

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOUNTAIN VIEW CENTERS, INC.

SMITA SANGHVI

Defendants

DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES FOR THE

ROBERT GOMEZ

CLAIRE MATSUSHITA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRAN A WEISER

3460 Wilshire Blvd Ste 1212

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF THE ATTRNEY GENERAL

300 S Spring St Ste 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT ORDERED MEDIATION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT ORDERED MEDIATION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

REPLY TO IN SUPPORT OF TO MOTION RE: JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS SET FOR HEARING ON 01/13/16 FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES FOR THE, ROBERT GOMEZ, CLAIRE MATSUSHITA. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO IN SUPPORT OF TO MOTION RE: JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS SET FOR HEARING ON 01/13/16 FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES FOR THE, ROBERT GOMEZ, CLAIRE MATSUSHITA. (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS SET FOR HEARING ON 01/13/16, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOUNTAIN VIEW CENTERS, INC., SMITA SANGHVI (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS SET FOR HEARING ON 01/13/16, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOUNTAIN VIEW CENTERS, INC., SMITA SANGHVI (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION AND SUPPORTING DOCS BY MAIL ON 11/30/15 AS TO FRANK A WEISER, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION AND SUPPORTING DOCS BY MAIL ON 11/30/15 AS TO FRANK A WEISER, FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

MOTION RE: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS SET FOR HEARING ON 01/13/16, FILED BY DEFENDANT DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES FOR THE, ROBERT GOMEZ, CLAIRE MATSUSHITA (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS SET FOR HEARING ON 01/13/16, FILED BY DEFENDANT DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES FOR THE, ROBERT GOMEZ, CLAIRE MATSUSHITA (IMAGED)

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY MOUNTAIN VIEW CENTERS, INC.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY MOUNTAIN VIEW CENTERS, INC.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS SET FOR HEARING ON 05/19/15, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOUNTAIN VIEW CENTERS, INC., SMITA SANGHVI (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS SET FOR HEARING ON 05/19/15, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOUNTAIN VIEW CENTERS, INC., SMITA SANGHVI (IMAGED)

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

MOTION RE: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS SET FOR HEARING ON 05/19/15, FILED BY DEFENDANT DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES FOR THE, ROBERT GOMEZ, CLAIRE MATSUSHITA (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS SET FOR HEARING ON 05/19/15, FILED BY DEFENDANT DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES FOR THE, ROBERT GOMEZ, CLAIRE MATSUSHITA (IMAGED)

GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES FOR THE, ROBERT GOMEZ, CLAIRE MATSUSHITA; REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY OFFICE OF THE ATTRNEY GENERAL.

GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES FOR THE, ROBERT GOMEZ, CLAIRE MATSUSHITA; REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY OFFICE OF THE ATTRNEY GENERAL.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 150120-2478 $435.00; 150120-2478-CK Reference Number 2312

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2016
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT ORDERED MEDIATION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT ORDERED MEDIATION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • MOTION RE: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY DEFENDANT DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES FOR THE, ROBERT GOMEZ, CLAIRE MATSUSHITA; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONNA GUNNELL GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA GABLE; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT C LOCKMAN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY FRANK WEISER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY BRITTNEY LOVATO PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE COURT GIVES ITS TENTATIVE RULING.; DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES FOR THE, ROBERT GOMEZ, CLAIRE MATSUSHITA'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IS HEARD.; ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; THE COURTS TENTATIVE BECOMES ITS FINAL.; DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES FOR THE, ROBERT GOMEZ, CLAIRE MATSUSHITAS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT; ON THE PLEADINGS IS GRANTED AS TO THE 1ST CAUSE OF ACTION AS TO DEFENDANTS GOMEZ AND MATSUSHITA; IN THEIR OFFICIAL CAPACITY, WITH 20 DAYS LEAVE TO AMEND.; DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES FOR THE, ROBERT GOMEZ, CLAIRE MATSUSHITAS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT; ON THE PLEADINGS IS DENIED AS TO THE 2ND AND 3RD CAUSES OF ACTION.; DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES FOR THE, ROBERT GOMEZ, CLAIRE MATSUSHITAS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT; ON THE PLEADINGS IS GRANTED AS TO THE 4TH CAUSE OF ACTION WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DONNA GUNNELL GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA GABLE; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT C LOCKMAN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY FRANK WEISER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY BRITTNEY LOVATO PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL, FOR PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL TO AMEND.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 03/17/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO IN SUPPORT OF TO MOTION RE: JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS SET FOR HEARING ON 01/13/16 FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES FOR THE, ROBERT GOMEZ, CLAIRE MATSUSHITA. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS SET FOR HEARING ON 01/13/16, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOUNTAIN VIEW CENTERS, INC., SMITA SANGHVI (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE TAKE NOTICE: THE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SET FOR; 12/22/15 IS HEREBY CONTINUED TO 01/13/16 TO BE HEARD WITH THE MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE; PLEADINGS CURRENTLY SET FOR 01/13/16 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT S24.; COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 01/13/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION AND SUPPORTING DOCS BY MAIL ON 11/30/15 AS TO FRANK A WEISER, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES FOR THE, ROBERT GOMEZ, CLAIRE MATSUSHITA ARE WAIVED FOR MOT FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN THE AMOUNT OF $90.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2015
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES FOR THE, ROBERT GOMEZ, CLAIRE MATSUSHITA ARE WAIVED FOR MOTION IN THE AMOUNT OF $90.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION RE: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS SET FOR HEARING ON 05/19/15, FILED BY DEFENDANT DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES FOR THE, ROBERT GOMEZ, CLAIRE MATSUSHITA (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES FOR THE, ROBERT GOMEZ, CLAIRE MATSUSHITA; REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY OFFICE OF THE ATTRNEY GENERAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES FOR THE, ROBERT GOMEZ, CLAIRE MATSUSHITA ARE WAIVED FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 150120-2478 $435.00; 150120-2478-CK Reference Number 2312

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.