This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 21:40:13 (UTC).

MOUNTAIN MAGIC VS BOUCHER

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 MOUNTAIN MAGIC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BOUCHER. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8361

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOUNTAIN MAGIC MOTORS

Defendant

LISA A BOUCHER

 

Court Documents

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF MOUNTAIN MAGIC MOTORS FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF MOUNTAIN MAGIC MOTORS FILED.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171101-0351 $50.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO LISA A BOUCHER. PARTY SERVED ON 11/10/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $75.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO LISA A BOUCHER. PARTY SERVED ON 11/10/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $75.00. (IMAGED)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:45; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; MOUNTAIN MAGIC MOTORS REPRESENTED BY MANOUCH LANKARANI.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: LISA A BOUCHER; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; LISA A BOUCHER HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; MANOUCH LANKARANI IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST LISA A BOUCHER.; JUDGMENT FOR: MOUNTAIN MAGIC MOTORS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LISA A BOUCHER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $125.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,625.00; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2018
  • WRIT AND MONEY ORDER CHECK IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THERE IS NO BAKERSFIELD COUNTY SHERIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • WRIT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $225.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $27.14 (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • MEMO RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $7.28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RETURNED UNABLE TO FORWARD AS TO LISA A BOUCHER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 01/10/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF MOUNTAIN MAGIC MOTORS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:45; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; MOUNTAIN MAGIC MOTORS REPRESENTED BY MANOUCH LANKARANI.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: LISA A BOUCHER; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; LISA A BOUCHER HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; MANOUCH LANKARANI IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST LISA A BOUCHER.; JUDGMENT FOR: MOUNTAIN MAGIC MOTORS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LISA A BOUCHER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $125.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,625.00; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO LISA A BOUCHER. PARTY SERVED ON 11/10/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $75.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171101-0351 $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less