This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/26/2021 at 15:27:05 (UTC).

MOSCATEL -V- SWAGWAY ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/21/2018 MOSCATEL filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against SWAGWAY. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Apaloo, Khymberli S, Davis, Keith D, Alvarez, Donald and Pirozzi, Elia V. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3306

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Apaloo, Khymberli S

Davis, Keith D

Alvarez, Donald

Pirozzi, Elia V

 

Party Details

Defendants and Not Yet Classified

BEST BUY STORES LP

HOVERZON, LLC

ZAKE IP HOLDINGS, LLC

PRO-COM PRODUCTS, INC

Not Yet Classified

BEST BUY STORE #775

BEST BUY STORES LP

BEST BUY INC DBA MN BEST BUY COMPANY INC

SWAGTRON USA

SWAGTRON

MN BEST BUY COMPANY, INC

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Daniels Fine Israel Schonbuch & Lebovits

Attorney at Daniels Fine Israel Schonbuch & Lebovits

NEW YORK (VC0096) AND CALIFORNIA LAWYER

120 South Del Mar Avenue #2875

San Gabriel, CA 91778

SCHONBUCH & LEBOVITS LLP

Attorney at Schonbuch & Lebovits LLP

1801 Century Park E 9Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Not Yet Classified Attorney

PRINDLE GOETZ BARNES & REINHOLTZ LLP

Attorney at Prindle Goetz Barnes & Reinholtz LLP

310 Golden Shore Fourth Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address Filed

06/24/2021: Notice of Change of Address Filed

Substitution of Attorney Filed

02/03/2021: Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney Filed

02/03/2021: Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney Filed

02/03/2021: Substitution of Attorney Filed

Legacy Minutes

12/22/2020: Legacy Minutes

**CV - Portal Minute Order

12/22/2020: **CV - Portal Minute Order

**CV - Portal Minute Order

12/22/2020: **CV - Portal Minute Order

**CV - Portal Minute Order

12/22/2020: **CV - Portal Minute Order

**CV - Portal Minute Order

12/22/2020: **CV - Portal Minute Order

**CV - Portal Minute Order

12/22/2020: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Opposition to Motion Filed

12/02/2020: Opposition to Motion Filed

On Court's Motion, Hearing Previously Set is Ordered Reset

11/30/2020: On Court's Motion, Hearing Previously Set is Ordered Reset

NOTICE OF TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DAT

10/27/2020: NOTICE OF TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DAT

ORDER FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE FILED

10/23/2020: ORDER FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE FILED

MOTION RE- PLA'S MTN TO QUASH SUBPOENA SET FOR HEA

10/21/2020: MOTION RE- PLA'S MTN TO QUASH SUBPOENA SET FOR HEA

MOTION RE- PLA'S MTN TO CMPL SUBPOENA SET FOR HEAR

10/21/2020: MOTION RE- PLA'S MTN TO CMPL SUBPOENA SET FOR HEAR

MOTION RE- PLA'S NTC OF MTN TO QUASH SUBPOENA SET

10/21/2020: MOTION RE- PLA'S NTC OF MTN TO QUASH SUBPOENA SET

MOTION RE- PLA'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA FOR PROD

10/21/2020: MOTION RE- PLA'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA FOR PROD

138 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Apaloo, Khymberli S; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketReadiness Calendar; Judicial Officer: Apaloo, Khymberli S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: MOTION RE: MTN TO QUASH SUBPNA FOR PROD OF BUS REC FROM FARMERS (102720) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARRY MOSCATEL, COLE MOSCATEL, KELSEA MOSCATEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: MOTION RE: MTN TO QUASH SUBPNA FOR PROD OF BUS REC FORM EXCEL ADJUSTERS (102720) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARRY MOSCATEL, COLE MOSCATEL, KELSEA MOSCATEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
311 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2018
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $4,116.93; Total Payments and Credits: $4,116.93

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full; Comment: PLAINTIFF HARRY MOSCATEL, COLE MOSCATEL, KELSEA MOSCATEL FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY HARRY MOSCATEL, COLE MOSCATEL, KELSEA MOSCATEL FOR 1ST APP FEES 181221-0104-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 181221-0104-CK REFERENCE NUMBER CK 05924

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less