This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 09:22:06 (UTC).

MORRIS -V- PASALIS/KILLEN SR

Case Summary

On 02/16/2017 MORRIS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PASALIS/KILLEN SR. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0051

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN MORRIS

Defendants

JOHN F KILLEN SR

DAINA K PASALIS

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAVALLETTO, ANDY

68703 Perez Road Ste A10

Cathedral City, CA 92234

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $230.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $230.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED TO ATTY ON 3/21/17)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED TO ATTY ON 3/21/17); Minutes; Receipt: 170321-0875 $25.00; 170321-0875-MC Reference Number 026-0017091245

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 02/16/2017 OF JOHN MORRIS ORDERED ENTERED 03/21/17; JUDGMENT FOR: JOHN MORRIS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DAINA K PASALIS, JOHN F KILLEN SR, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: DAINA K PASALIS, JOHN F KILLEN SR, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST DAINA K PASALIS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST DAINA K PASALIS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JOHN F KILLEN SR FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JOHN F KILLEN SR FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/04/17 WITH FEES OF $35.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/04/17 WITH FEES OF $35.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO DAINA K PASALIS SERVED ON 03/04/17 WITH COSTS OF $35.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO DAINA K PASALIS SERVED ON 03/04/17 WITH COSTS OF $35.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JOHN F KILLEN SR; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 03/04/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JOHN F KILLEN SR; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 03/04/17

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170221-0160 $255.00; 170221-0160-MC Reference Number 026-0005879877

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $230.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170321-0890 $12.69; 170321-0890-MC Reference Number 026-0017095433

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED TO ATTY ON 3/21/17); Minutes; Receipt: 170321-0875 $25.00; 170321-0875-MC Reference Number 026-0017091245

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $18.30.--BEGINNING ON 02/15/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 02/16/2017 OF JOHN MORRIS ORDERED ENTERED 03/21/17; JUDGMENT FOR: JOHN MORRIS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DAINA K PASALIS, JOHN F KILLEN SR, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: DAINA K PASALIS, JOHN F KILLEN SR, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/16/2017 OF JOHN MORRIS AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/04/17 WITH FEES OF $35.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO DAINA K PASALIS SERVED ON 03/04/17 WITH COSTS OF $35.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JOHN F KILLEN SR; PARTY SERVED ON 03/04/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • 4/10/17 8:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • 4/10/17 8:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • ADA NOTICE MAILED OUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170221-0162 $17.00; 170221-0162-MC Reference Number 026-0005879877

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170221-0160 $255.00; 170221-0160-MC Reference Number 026-0005879877

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less