This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 12:10:35 (UTC).

MORIN-V-LITTLE IMPRESSION, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/21/2018 MORIN-V-LITTLE IMPRESSION was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4962

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DANIELLE MORIN

ESTATE OF DEACON MORIN, BY ANDTHROUGH

Defendants and Cross Defendants

LITTLE IMPRESSIONSCHILD CARE,

LITTLE IMPRESSIONSDAYCARE ANDLEARNING

TROY FIELDS

RANDY LUTZ

BAMBERO

CHEN HAO

ALGIMANTAS SESELSKIS

JIMENEZ FAMILY CHILD CARE,

ETSY, INC.

DEBORAH JIMENEZ

REBECCA LUTZ

JIMENEZ FAMILY CHILD CARE HOME

MARRIOTT FAMILY CHILD CARE,

NICK STEWART

SAGAN MARRIOTT

RANDY JIMENEZ

ALGIMANTAS SESELKIS

Cross Plaintiffs

MARRIOTT FAMILY CHILD CARE

DEBORAH JIMENEZ

SAGAN MARRIOTT

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARPENTER, ZUCKERMAN & ROWLEY,LLP

18600 Macarthur Blvd Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92612

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

THE SAFARIAN FIRM,APC

3150 Montrose Avenue

Glendale, CA 91214

WOOD SMITH HENNING& BERMAN LLP

10960 Wilshire Blvd 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

WALKER & KIRKPATRICK

21243 Ventura Blvd Suite 201

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

 

Court Documents

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/06/19, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DANIELLE MORIN (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/06/19, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DANIELLE MORIN (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/06/19, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DANIELLE MORIN (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/06/19, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DANIELLE MORIN (IMAGED)

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: COMPEL FRTHER RESP TO REQ FOR PRODUCTION SET FOR HEARING ON 08/01/19, FILED BY DEFENDANT ETSY, INC. (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: COMPEL FRTHER RESP TO REQ FOR PRODUCTION SET FOR HEARING ON 08/01/19, FILED BY DEFENDANT ETSY, INC. (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

COURT RULING ON DEFENDANT ETSYS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED.

COURT RULING ON DEFENDANT ETSYS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ETSY, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/06/19 WITH COSTS OF $185.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ETSY, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/06/19 WITH COSTS OF $185.00 FILED.

DEMURRER FILED BY ETSY, INC.; REPRESENTED BY WOOD SMITH HENNING& BERMAN LLP(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY ETSY, INC.; REPRESENTED BY WOOD SMITH HENNING& BERMAN LLP(IMAGED)

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST LITTLE IMPRESSIONSCHILD CARE, FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST LITTLE IMPRESSIONSCHILD CARE, FILED.

ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO QUASH SERVICE AND SET ASIDE DEFAULT FILED

ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO QUASH SERVICE AND SET ASIDE DEFAULT FILED; Minutes; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT ETSY, INC..; SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AS TO ETSY, INC.; NEW SERVICE REQUIRED ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/21/2018 OF DANIELLE MORIN ON DEFENDANT ETSY, INC.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ANSWER FILED BY MARRIOTT FAMILY CHILD CARE,, SAGAN MARRIOTT, DEBORAH JIMENEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WALKER & KIRKPATRICK.

ANSWER FILED BY MARRIOTT FAMILY CHILD CARE,, SAGAN MARRIOTT, DEBORAH JIMENEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WALKER & KIRKPATRICK.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ETSY, INC. SERVED ON 11/01/18 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ETSY, INC. SERVED ON 11/01/18 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

AMENDMENT TO DOE 2 NAMING DOES 2 TO BE CHEN HAO AKA HAO D CHEN FILED.

AMENDMENT TO DOE 2 NAMING DOES 2 TO BE CHEN HAO AKA HAO D CHEN FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2019
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SERVICE/DEFAULT/TRIAL SETTING CONFRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • NEW VOLUME MADE. VOLUME 2 INCLUDES DOCUMENTS FILED BETWEEN 06/05/19 AND 07/15/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RULING ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL HELD ON 8/01/19 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DANIELLE MORIN FOR STIP FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 190805-0165 $20.00; 190805-0165-CK Reference Number 43725

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • MOTION RE: COMPEL FURTHER RESPNSE TO RQST FOR PROD OF DOCS, SET ONE FILED BY PLAINTIFF DANIELLE MORIN, ESTATE OF DEACON MORIN, BY ANDTHROUGH; Disposition: Under Submission; Minutes; WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR., JUDGE; CLERK: WIMALA BLANCHARD; COURT REPORTER TRACI TROLI 13302; COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY CARLOS HERNANDEZ PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY CARLA GAGNA APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MARRIOTT FAMILY CHILD CARE,, SAGAN MARRIOTT, DEBORAH JIMENEZ.; ATTORNEY STACY BLACK PRESENT FOR DEFT- ETSY, INC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; DANIELLE MORIN, ESTATE OF DEACON MORIN, BY ANDTHROUGH'S MOTION RE: COMPEL FRTHR RESP TO RQST FOR PROD DOCS SET 1 IS HEARD.; COURT HAS READ AND CONSIDERED MOTION AND OPPOSING DOCUMENTS.; MOTION ARGUED BY COUNSEL.; COURT FINDS:; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION.; 02:15; SUBSEQUENTLY COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: THE COURT DENIES PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER; RESPONSES TO REQUEST NO #1 AND 10. THE MOTION AS TO REQUEST NO #9 IS MOOT.; WRITTEN ORDER AS ATTACHED IS APPROVED BY THE COURT AND ORDERED INCORPORATED INTO THE MINUTE ORDER, AND REFERENCED AS THOUGH FULLY SET FORTH HEREIN, AND EACH OF THE PARTIES IS DIRECTED TO EXECUTE; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER 8/01/19- COPY OF RULING TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • MOTION RE: COMPEL FRTHR RESPNSE TO FORM ROGS, SET ONE FILED BY PLAINTIFF DANIELLE MORIN, ESTATE OF DEACON MORIN, BY ANDTHROUGH; Disposition: Under Submission; Minutes; WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR., JUDGE; CLERK: WIMALA BLANCHARD; COURT REPORTER TRACI TROLI 13302; COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY CARLOS HERNANDEZ PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY CARLA GAGNA APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MARRIOTT FAMILY CHILD CARE,, SAGAN MARRIOTT, DEBORAH JIMENEZ.; ATTORNEY STACY BLANK PRESENT FOR DEFT- ETSY, INC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; DANIELLE MORIN, ESTATE OF DEACON MORIN, BY ANDTHROUGH'S MOTION RE: COMPEL FRTHR RESPNSE TO FORM ROGS, SET ONE IS HEARD.; COURT HAS READ AND CONSIDERED THE MOTION AND OPPOSING DOCUMENTS.; MOTION ARGUED BY COUNSEL.; COURT FINDS:; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION.; 02:00; SUBSEQUENTLY COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON THE MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO FORM INTERROGATORY; NO #3.7 AND 4.1 WITHIN 20 DAYS, SUBJECT TO THE PROTECTIVE ORDER BEING FILED. THE COURT DENIES; PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORY NO #16.1. THE MOTION AS TO; FORM INTERROGATORY NO #15.1 IS MOOT. THE COURT DENIES PARTIES REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS.; WRITTEN ORDER AS ATTACHED IS APPROVED BY THE COURT AND ORDERED INCORPORATED INTO THE MINUTE ORDER, AND REFERENCED AS THOUGH FULLY SET FORTH HEREIN, AND EACH OF THE PARTIES IS DIRECTED TO EXECUTE; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER 8/01/19-COPY OF RULING TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO OPPO TO MOTION RE: COMPEL FRTHER RESP FOR PRODUCTION SET FOR HEARING ON 08/01/19 FILED BY DANIELLE MORIN. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: COMPEL FRTHR RESP TO FORM INTERROGATORIES SET FOR HEARING ON 07/01/19, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DANIELLE MORIN (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • NEW VOLUME MADE. VOLUME 1 INCLUDES DOCUMENTS FILED BETWEEN 09/21/18 AND 05/28/19

    Read MoreRead Less
111 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180926-0665 $10.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • PLAINTIFF DANIELLE MORIN FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DANIELLE MORIN FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180921-0827 $435.00; 180921-0827-CK Reference Number 70013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/21/2018 OF DANIELLE MORIN, ESTATE OF DEACON MORIN, BY ANDTHROUGH, LITTLE IMPRESSIONSDAYCARE ANDLEARNING, JIMENEZ FAMILY CHILD CARE,, JIMENEZ FAMILY CHILD CARE HOME, MARRIOTT FAMILY CHILD CARE,, SAGAN MARRIOTT, REBECCA LUTZ, DEBORAH JIMENEZ, NICK STEWART, ETSY, INC. IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.