This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/14/2021 at 18:12:00 (UTC).

MORENO VS CALIFORNIA MENTOR

Case Summary

On 10/23/2019 MORENO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CALIFORNIA MENTOR. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sinfield, Lily L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7354

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Sinfield, Lily L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SUSANA MORENO

MORENO, SUSANA

Defendant

CALIFORNIA MENTOR

Not Yet Classified

CONV

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VACATED DOCUMENTS SENT. PLAINTIFFS CLAIM

11/20/2019: NOTICE OF VACATED DOCUMENTS SENT. PLAINTIFFS CLAIM

CERTIFICATE AND ORDER VACATING DOCUMENTS FILED. PL

11/20/2019: CERTIFICATE AND ORDER VACATING DOCUMENTS FILED. PL

REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED. (IMAGED) 191119-007

11/19/2019: REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED. (IMAGED) 191119-007

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO CALIFORNIA MENTOR; PA

10/31/2019: PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO CALIFORNIA MENTOR; PA

NOTICE OF ORDER ON DENIED FEE WAIVER SENT. COPY OF

10/29/2019: NOTICE OF ORDER ON DENIED FEE WAIVER SENT. COPY OF

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

10/25/2019: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF -$5,000 -$10,000(IMAGED)

10/23/2019: CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF -$5,000 -$10,000(IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Hearing; Original Type: Small Claims Hearing; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCase Destroyed Pursuant to Gov Code 68152-68153; Comment: CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 12/26/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketVacate Hearing Scheduled; Comment: VACATE HSC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 12/30/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F8.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Sinfield, Lily L; Judgment Type: Dismissal; Comment; Comment: (ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NON-PAYMENT FOR FILING FEES.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketVacate Hearing Scheduled; Comment: VACATE NFF2 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/08/19 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT FWF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Sent re:; Comment: NOTICE OF VACATED DOCUMENTS SENT. PLAINTIFFS CLAIM IS VACATED PLEASE SEE ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate & Order Vacating Docs Filed. Ntc Sent to Parties; Judicial Officer: Sinfield, Lily L; Comment: CERTIFICATE AND ORDER VACATING DOCUMENTS FILED. PLAINTIFFS CLAIM IS/ARE HEREBY VACATED. NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. LILY L SINFIELD,JUDGE CLERK: VALERIE APARICIO PARTIES NOT PRESENT: SUSANA MORENO, CALIFORNIA MENTOR PER JUDGES ORDERS PLAINTIFFS CLAIM IS VACATED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT FOR FILING FEES ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NON-PAYMENT FOR FILING FEES. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20191119-0079; ConversionPayment; $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20191023-0663; ConversionPayment; $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $25.00; Total Payments and Credits: $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketUpdate Party Address; Comment: PARTY CALIFORNIA MENTOR UPDATED: DEFENDANT ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Service by Certified Mail to:; Comment: SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EACH DEFENDANT. 191023-0663-VS SMM/ 15.00 PAYMT 191023-0663-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 037-0004474545

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketRequest for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY SUSANA MORENO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Military Service; Comment: DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketUpdate Default Department to:; Comment: UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff >$5,000 <$10,000 Filed; Comment: CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where California Mentor is a litigant