This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 05:52:58 (UTC).

MORENO ET AL -V- NASSCO DEVELOPMENT

Case Summary

On 12/16/2016 MORENO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against NASSCO DEVELOPMENT. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1631

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GUADALUPE MORENO

JULIO MORENO

LAZARO RAMIREZ

ROBERTO SOLORIO

LUIS MORENO

Defendants

INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

JAMAL NASSERI

NASSCO DEVELOPMENTINC

JAMAL NASSEREDINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUPRICH/VEGAATTORNEYS AT LAW

959 E. Colorado Blvd Suite 217

Pasadena, CA 91106

Defendant Attorney

MARK B PLUMMER

18552 Oriente Dr

Yorba Linda, CA 92886

 

Court Documents

DEFS WITNESS LIST FILED.

DEFS WITNESS LIST FILED.

PLAS WITNESS LIST FILED.

PLAS WITNESS LIST FILED.

PLAS EXHIBIT LIST FILED.

PLAS EXHIBIT LIST FILED.

DEFS EXHIBIT LIST FILED.

DEFS EXHIBIT LIST FILED.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO LUIS MORENO, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO LUIS MORENO, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO JULIO MORENO, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO JULIO MORENO, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY NASSCO DEVELOPMENTINC, JAMAL NASSEREDINE, INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY NASSCO DEVELOPMENTINC, JAMAL NASSEREDINE, INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY GUADALUPE MORENO.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY GUADALUPE MORENO.

ANSWER FILED BY NASSCO DEVELOPMENTINC, JAMAL NASSEREDINE, INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MARK B PLUMMER.

ANSWER FILED BY NASSCO DEVELOPMENTINC, JAMAL NASSEREDINE, INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MARK B PLUMMER.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/06/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/06/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.00 FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/16/2016 OF GUADALUPE MORENO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/16/2016 OF GUADALUPE MORENO; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; THOMAS S. GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: REGINA ESTRADA; COURT REPORTER MARIANNE REID 11053; COURT ATTENDANT A MARTINEZ; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ROGER O. VEGA PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY MARK B. PLUMMER PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL IS INFORMED THIS COURT IS COMMENCING TRIAL ON ANOTHER MATTER. DUE TO THE COURTS; UNAVAILABILITY PARTIES STIPULATE TO A CONTINUANCE.; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 1 DAY.; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 09/20/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S27; COURT TRIAL ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/16/2016 OF GUADALUPE MORENO IS SET FOR 09/24/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S27; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/16/2016 OF GUADALUPE MORENO; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; THOMAS S. GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: SULMA TORRES; COURT REPORTER MARIANNE REID 11053; COURT ATTENDANT C LEPE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JOSEPH HUPRICH APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR GUADALUPE MORENO, LUIS MORENO, JULIO MORENO, ROBERTO SOLORIO, LAZARO RAMIREZ.; ATTORNEY MARK PLUMMER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR NASSCO DEVELOPMENTINC, JAMAL NASSEREDINE, INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COURT INFORMS COUNSEL, S27 IS CURRENTLY ENGAGED IN TRIAL.; COURT ORDERS PARTIES MEET AND CONFER FOLLOWING TODAYS HEARING AND DISCUSS TRIAL DATES SET; TODAY. IF NEW TRIAL DATES DO NOT WORK FOR PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL, PARTIES ARE TO CONTACT; DEPARTMENT S27 DIRECTLY WITH NEW STIPULATED DATE.; TRIAL DATES ARE SET AS FOLLOWS:; HEARINGS:; VACATE CTN HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/23/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S27.; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 07/26/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S27; COURT TRIAL ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/16/2016 OF GUADALUPE MORENO IS SET FOR 07/30/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S27; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 3 DAYS; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/16/2016 OF GUADALUPE MORENO; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; THOMAS S. GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: SULMA TORRES; COURT REPORTER MARIANNE REID 11053; COURT ATTENDANT C LEPE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ROGER VEGA PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY MARK PLUMMER PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF AND DEFENSE COUNSEL.; REASON: COURT IS CURRENTLY ENGAGED IN TRIAL; COURT GIVES PERMISSION TO BOTH PLAINTIFF AND DEFENSE COUNSEL TO APPEAR VIA COURT CALL AT NEXT; HEARING OR TO HAVE NON TRIAL COUNSEL APPEAR ON THEIR BEHALF.; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 04/19/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S27; VACATE CTN HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/26/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S27.; COURT TRIAL ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/16/2016 OF GUADALUPE MORENO IS SET FOR 04/23/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S27; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFS WITNESS LIST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAS WITNESS LIST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • NO SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 026-0002016126

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GUADALUPE MORENO FOR FAX FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161221-0325 $20.00; 161221-0325-VS Reference Number 269061

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GUADALUPE MORENO FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161221-0323 $435.00; 161221-0323-VS Reference Number 269061

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY GUADALUPE MORENO

    Read MoreRead Less