This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 18:21:15 (UTC).

MORALES VS MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 MORALES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARTINEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7489

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVELINO MORALES

Defendant

GERARDO RAMOS MARTINEZ

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0593 $50.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO GERARDO RAMOS MARTINEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 10/24/17 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO GERARDO RAMOS MARTINEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 10/24/17 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Pre-D Complete

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TONY RAPHAEL, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF AVELINO MORALES PRESENT; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:36; COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE.; GERARDO RAMOS MARTINEZ HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- AVELINO MORALES IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST GERARDO RAMOS MARTINEZ.; JUDGMENT FOR: AVELINO MORALES; JUDGMENT AGAINST: GERARDO RAMOS MARTINEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,000.00; 10:42; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2017
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 11/21/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TONY RAPHAEL, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF AVELINO MORALES PRESENT; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:36; COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE.; GERARDO RAMOS MARTINEZ HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- AVELINO MORALES IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST GERARDO RAMOS MARTINEZ.; JUDGMENT FOR: AVELINO MORALES; JUDGMENT AGAINST: GERARDO RAMOS MARTINEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,000.00; 10:42; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO GERARDO RAMOS MARTINEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 10/24/17 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • POS-SIGNED RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EACH DEFENDANT.; Minutes; Receipt: 171019-0669 $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY AVELINO MORALES FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0597 $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0593 $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less