This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 14:46:22 (UTC).

MONZELLA ANOLA SHANHOLTZER

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 MONZELLA ANOLA SHANHOLTZER was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0086

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

JANINE M LILLEGAARD

MELONIE SHANHOLTZER

Decedent

MONZELLA ANOLA SHANHOLTZER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SCHAUF, CAROLYN J

177 E Colorado Blvd Ste 200

Pasadena, CA 91105

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JANINE M LILLEGAARD FOR CC OF ORDR DETERMINING SUCCESSION; Minutes; Receipt: 160324-0040 $26.00; 160324-0040-CK Reference Number 1108

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; CYNTHIA A LUDVIGSEN, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY REYNOLDS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY CAROLYN J. SCHAUF APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JANINE M LILLEGAARD.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); COURT APPROVES PETITION.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • HRG OF 03/21/16 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • HRG OF 03/21/16 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $3,594.87.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 03/21/16 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 160202-0419 $465.00; 160202-0419-CK Reference Number 1073

    Read MoreRead Less