This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/05/2019 at 03:34:09 (UTC).

MONTOYA-V-BROOKS

Case Summary

On 01/19/2016 MONTOYA-V-BROOKS was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0651

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

YESENIA MONTOYA

ROCIO JIMENEZ

RAFAEL VARGAS

MALACHI MONTOYA

ALEXIS HERNANDEZ

LUCIA HERNANDEZ

Defendants

BROOK MARIE BROOKS

BRYAN SCOTT BROOKS

BROOKE M BROOKS

Plaintiffs and Minors

RAFAEL VARGAS

MALACHI MONTOYA

ALEXIS HERNANDEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF SEAN S. VAHDAT

1224 East Katella Ave Suite 211

Orange, CA 92867

LAW OFFICES OF SEAN S. VAHDAT & ASSOCIATES

1224 East Katella Ave Suite 211

Orange, CA 92867

Defendant Attorney

GILBERT, KELLY, CROWLEY & JENNETT LLP

550 South Hope Street 22Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY IN THE AMOUNT OF $4,685.61 FILED.

ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY IN THE AMOUNT OF $4,685.61 FILED.

ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF MINOR'S CLAIM FILED.

ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF MINOR'S CLAIM FILED.

ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF MINOR'S CLAIM FILED.

ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF MINOR'S CLAIM FILED.

ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF MINOR'S CLAIM FILED.

ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF MINOR'S CLAIM FILED.

SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 01/19/2016 OF YESENIA MONTOYA BY YESENIA MONTOYA.

SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 01/19/2016 OF YESENIA MONTOYA BY YESENIA MONTOYA.

SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 01/19/2016 OF YESENIA MONTOYA BY ROCIO JIMENEZ.

SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 01/19/2016 OF YESENIA MONTOYA BY ROCIO JIMENEZ.

SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 01/19/2016 OF YESENIA MONTOYA BY ALEXIS HERNANDEZ.

SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 01/19/2016 OF YESENIA MONTOYA BY ALEXIS HERNANDEZ.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFO FILED BY YESENIA MONTOYA, ROCIO JIMENEZ, ALEXIS HERNANDEZ, RAFAEL VARGAS, MALACHI MONTOYA.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFO FILED BY YESENIA MONTOYA, ROCIO JIMENEZ, ALEXIS HERNANDEZ, RAFAEL VARGAS, MALACHI MONTOYA.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY BROOK MARIE BROOKS.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY BROOK MARIE BROOKS.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 01/19/2016 OF YESENIA MONTOYA FILED CHANGING NAME OF BROOKE M BROOKS TO BROOK MARIE BROOKS;

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 01/19/2016 OF YESENIA MONTOYA FILED CHANGING NAME OF BROOKE M BROOKS TO BROOK MARIE BROOKS;

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON BRYAN SCOTT BROOKS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/25/16 WITH COSTS OF $50.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON BRYAN SCOTT BROOKS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/25/16 WITH COSTS OF $50.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BROOK MARIE BROOKS SERVED ON 02/29/16 WITH FEES OF $51.64.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BROOK MARIE BROOKS SERVED ON 02/29/16 WITH FEES OF $51.64.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT SET FOR 03/07/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT SET FOR 03/07/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT SET FOR 03/07/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT R MITTAN; APPEARANCES:; SEAN S. VAHDAT APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR YESENIA MONTOYA.; DANIEL WALSH APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR BRYAN SCOTT BROOKS.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THERE BEING NO OPPOSITION STATED BY PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL, THE COURT ORDERS THE COMPLAINT; DISMISSED.; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF YESENIA MONTOYA, ON 03/07/17; WITH PREJUDICE; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • VACATE OSCVF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/07/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • RECEIPT AND ACKNOWLEDMENT OF ORDER FOR DEPOSIT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): A COPY OF THE ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • FILE ROUTED TO S30 FOR 3/7 HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; REASON: TO TRAIL THE OSC RE: VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 03/07/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • FILE ROUTED TO S30 FOR 1/24 HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2016
  • PARTY ALEXIS HERNANDEZ UPDATED: LAST NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY YESENIA MONTOYA FOR FIRST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 160119-2238 $435.00; 160119-2238-CK Reference Number 378804

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 01/19/2016 OF YESENIA MONTOYA, BROOKE M BROOKS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 01/19/2016 OF YESENIA MONTOYA, ROCIO JIMENEZ, ALEXIS HERNANDEZ, RAFAEL VARGAS, MALACHI MONTOYA IS ADDED AS A PLAS.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.