This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 10/13/2018 at 23:49:52 (UTC).

MONTGOMERY -V- COLORADO RIVER CHEVROLET

Case Summary

On 01/15/2010 MONTGOMERY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against COLORADO RIVER CHEVROLET. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Needles Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0001

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLIVIA MONTGOMERY

Defendant

COLORADO RIVER CHEVROLET

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/16/2010

DocketROAD-KINGMAN-AZ 86409-COLORADA RIVER CHEVROLET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2010

DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT RETURNED WITH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2010

DocketFORWARD ADDRESS-REMAILED TO 3601 STOCKTON HILL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2010

DocketFEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 100319-1892 $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2010

DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 03/02/10

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2010

DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Under Submission; Minutes; MARGARET A POWERS PRESIDING.; CLERK: BEBEANNA FLETCHER; COURT REPORTER IRV C SCHEIBE 1237; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF OLIVIA MONTGOMERY PRESENT; DEFENDANT COLORADO RIVER CHEVROLET PRESENT; JIM SMITH PRESENT FOR COLORADO RIVER CHEVROLET; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY OLIVIA MONTGOMERY .; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY JIM SMITH .; BOTH PARTIES SUBMIT DOCUMENTS FOR COURTS REVIEW.; ALL DOCUMENTS RETURNED TO PARTIES.; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 01/15/2010 OF OLIVIA MONTGOMERY AS FOLLOWS:; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT OLIVIA MONTGOMERY HAVE &; RECOVER FROM COLORADO RIVER CHEVROLET:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,250.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $20.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,270.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2010

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM & ORDER FILED AS TO COLORADO RIVER CHEVROLET. PARTY SERVED ON 01/29/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $20.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2010

DocketNOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2010

DocketCLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 100115-2137 $50.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2010

DocketUPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO N1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less