This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 01:00:23 (UTC).

MONIQUE PANTOJA-N-LUIS RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 MONIQUE PANTOJA-N-LUIS RODRIGUEZ was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0611

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MONIQUE PANTOJA

Respondent

LUIS RODRIGUEZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180117-0683 $18.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT -- DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 12/11/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 12/14/2016 OF MONIQUE PANTOJA FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 12/14/2016 OF MONIQUE PANTOJA ORDERED ENTERED 12/11/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • JUDGMENT SIGNED TRACKED TO PROCESSING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY LUIS RODRIGUEZ FOR PRELIMINARY/FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • STIPULATION AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON LUIS RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • JUDGMENT RECEIVED RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: CONFORMED COPY OF REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT RECEIVED BACK FROM POST OFFICE FOR LUIS RODRIGUEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LUIS RODRIGUEZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURNED JUDGMENT SENT.; Minutes; PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS HAS NOT BEEN SUBMITTEDTHAT IS A REQUIRED FORM TO PLACE CASE; IS DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MONIQUE PANTOJA IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON MONIQUE PANTOJA FOR 1ST FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MONIQUE PANTOJA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S51

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.