This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:10:00 (UTC).

MONICA MUNOZ -V- BRIGHT FUTURES ACADEMY

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 MONICA MUNOZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BRIGHT FUTURES ACADEMY. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1398

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONICA VANESSA MUNOZ

Defendants

RALPH CORONA

PAMELA LAMBERTH

QUEST TRANSPORTATION SPECIALISTS, LLC

BETTY TERESA COLUCCI

JEFFERY LECOMTE

BRIGHT FUTURES ACADEMY, LLC

SHINIECE S SIMPSON

LUIS A BONILLA

FATIMA M MADRIGAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF DALE MOWICKI, INC

15068 Rosecrans Ave #269

La Mirado, CA 90638

Defendant Attorneys

BERMAN BERMAN BERMANSCHNEIDER & LOWARY LLP

3890 Tenth Street Second Floor

Riverside, CA 92501

GATES, O'DOHERTY, GONTER & GUY

38 Discovery Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92618

NEIL, DYMOTT, FRANK, MCCABE & HUDSON, APLC

41-990-F Cook Street Suite 2004

Palm Desert, CA 92211

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO SHINIECE S SIMPSON. PARTY SERVED ON 04/21/61. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL/NAR. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO SHINIECE S SIMPSON. PARTY SERVED ON 04/21/61. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL/NAR. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO JEFFERY LECOMTE. PARTY SERVED ON 04/26/18. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL/NAR. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO JEFFERY LECOMTE. PARTY SERVED ON 04/26/18. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL/NAR. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO PAMELA LAMBERTH. PARTY SERVED ON 04/16/18. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL.NAR. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO PAMELA LAMBERTH. PARTY SERVED ON 04/16/18. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL.NAR. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO BRIGHT FUTURES ACADEMY, LLC. PARTY SERVED ON 04/26/18. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL/ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO BRIGHT FUTURES ACADEMY, LLC. PARTY SERVED ON 04/26/18. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL/ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT PURSUANT TO STIPULATED AGREEMENT FILED

ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT PURSUANT TO STIPULATED AGREEMENT FILED; Minutes; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT FATIMA M MADRIGAL.; SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AS TO FATIMA M MADRIGAL

STIPULATION RE: TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED.

STIPULATION RE: TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST FATIMA M MADRIGAL FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST FATIMA M MADRIGAL FILED.

REPLY TO PLAS OPPO TO MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORITONS OF PLAS 1ST AMND COMPLT SET FOR HEARING ON 03/14/18 FILED BY BRIGHT FUTURES ACADEMY, LLC, BETTY TERESA COLUCCI, PAMELA LAMBERTH, JEFFERY LECOMTE, SHINIECE S SIMPSON. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO PLAS OPPO TO MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORITONS OF PLAS 1ST AMND COMPLT SET FOR HEARING ON 03/14/18 FILED BY BRIGHT FUTURES ACADEMY, LLC, BETTY TERESA COLUCCI, PAMELA LAMBERTH, JEFFERY LECOMTE, SHINIECE S SIMPSON. (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/14/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONICA VANESSA MUNOZ (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/14/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONICA VANESSA MUNOZ (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: STRIKE SET FOR HEARING ON 03/14/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONICA VANESSA MUNOZ (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: STRIKE SET FOR HEARING ON 03/14/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONICA VANESSA MUNOZ (IMAGED)

DECLARATION OF MONICA MUNOZ PURSUANT TO SEC CCP377.32 FILED

DECLARATION OF MONICA MUNOZ PURSUANT TO SEC CCP377.32 FILED

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO QUEST TRANSPORTATION SPECIALISTS, LLC SERVED ON 01/08/18 WITH FEES OF $59.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO QUEST TRANSPORTATION SPECIALISTS, LLC SERVED ON 01/08/18 WITH FEES OF $59.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO PAMELA LAMBERTH SERVED ON 12/15/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO PAMELA LAMBERTH SERVED ON 12/15/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS (TURBOCOURT) SENT.

NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS (TURBOCOURT) SENT.; Minutes; PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ARE BEING RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): SPOKE TO ATTORNEY; AND HE WILL BE RESUBMITTING PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS TO REFLECT CORRECT DOCUMENTS BEING; SERVED. DECLARATION DOES NOT MATCH POS-010 DOCUMENTS SERVED. DECLARATION STATES THE; DOCUMENTS SERVED WERE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT.; NOTICES PRINTED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF MONICA MUNOZ - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF MONICA MUNOZ - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF MONICA MUNOZ

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF MONICA MUNOZ

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0570 $435.00; 171030-0570-VS Reference Number 033-0039366289

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF DEFT RALPH CORONA FOR FTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY FATIMA M MADRIGAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR FATIMA M MADRIGAL.; Minutes; Receipt: 180725-0345 $150.00; 180725-0345-CK Reference Number 005101

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR BRIGHT FUTURES ACADEMY, LLC.; Minutes; Receipt: 180719-0885 $150.00; 180719-0885-CK Reference Number 6147

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY BRIGHT FUTURES ACADEMY, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR BRIGHT FUTURES ACADEMY, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • ANSWER FILED BY QUEST TRANSPORTATION SPECIALISTS, LLC, LUIS A BONILLA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY GATES, O'DOHERTY, GONTER & GUY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND FILE ANSWER FILED.; Minutes; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT QUEST TRANSPORTATION SPECIALISTS, LLC, LUIS A BONILLA.; SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AS TO QUEST TRANSPORTATION SPECIALISTS, LLC, LUIS A BONILLA; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2017
  • ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF MONICA MUNOZ, LUIS A BONILLA, FATIMA M MADRIGAL, SHINIECE S SIMPSON IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF MONICA MUNOZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/30/2017 OF MONICA MUNOZ, QUEST TRANSPORTATION SPECIALISTS, LLC, BETTY TERESA COLUCCI, PAMELA LAMBERTH, JEFFERY LECOMTE, RALPH CORONA IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PLAINTIFF MONICA VANESSA MUNOZ FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0570 $435.00; 171030-0570-VS Reference Number 033-0039366289

    Read MoreRead Less