This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 12/12/2022 at 18:10:11 (UTC).

MOHAMMED EL NASLEH -V- CALIFORNIA RESTAURANTS

Case Summary

On 05/23/2018 MOHAMMED EL NASLEH filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CALIFORNIA RESTAURANTS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are David Cohn, Tomberlin, John M, Poncin, Lynn and Cohn, David. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2587

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

David Cohn

Tomberlin, John M

Poncin, Lynn

Cohn, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EL NASLEH, MOHAMMED

Defendants

CALIFORNIA SPAGHETTI RESTAURANTS INC

OSF INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Friedman, Todd Michael

Defendant Attorney

FISHER & PHILLIPS LLP

Attorney at FISHER & PHILLIPS LLP

621 Capitol Mall Suite 1400

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

Motion re:

* Public *

Stipulation & Order filed

* Public *

Order signed and Filed

* Public *

Notice of Ruling Filed

* Public *

Notice Returning Documents

* Public *

**CV - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

Stipulation and Order Filed

* Public *

Tentative decisions

* Public *

Declaration Filed

* Public *

Declaration Filed

* Public *

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

* Public *

**CV - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

Notice Filed

* Public *

Notice Filed

* Public *

Notice

Notice

Correspondence Coversheet

* Public *

Correspondence Coversheet

* Public *

Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

* Public *

137 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Ruling Filed; Filed By: MOHAMMED EL NASLEH; Comments: Notice of Ruling Re August 22,2022 ex parte application for order modifying this courts order granting plaintiffs motion of final approval of class action settlement and motion for attorneys fees, cost, and incentive award

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comments: Motions for Attorney Fees and Final Approval are returned because there were no reservations made. Please revise and resubmit.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Documents Received:; Comments: Joint Stip/Order to Amend Arnold Complaint received in S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • HearingType: Status Conference: Re: Filing Motion for Preliminary Approval; Department: Department S26 - SBJC; Judge: Cohn, David; Result: Cancelled - Vacated; Court Reporter: Vega, Regina

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Tentative decisions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order signed and Filed; Comments: Granting Motion for Preliminary Approval

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Stipulation and Order Filed; Comments: Granting consolidation.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Case Consolidated Master File:; Comments: CIVDS1705798

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $1965.00; Payment: $1965.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $60.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2021-45367

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
153 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Comments: FILING FEE PAID BY CALIFORNIA SPAGHETTI RESTAURANTS INC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES 180730-0591-CK CVT/ 435.00 PAYMT 180730-0591-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 3625991

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:; Comments: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CALIFORNIA SPAGHETTI RESTAURANTS INC SERVED ON 05/30/18 WITH FEES OF $69.50.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $435.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: 20180523-0831

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $435.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice Imaged; Comments: NOTICE IMAGED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Certificate of Assignment Received; Comments: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint and Party Information Entered; Comments: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED 180523-0831-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 180523-0831-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 122658

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comments: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketFile Type: Case Assigned for All Purposes; Comments: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Comments: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less