This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 21:11:18 (UTC).

MOHAMMAD ASIF

Case Summary

On 09/18/2017 MOHAMMAD ASIF was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0888

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MOHAMMAD HARRIS BIN ASIF

Decedent

MOHAMMAD ASIF

Other

LISA E SPIWAK ESQ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MADDUX, MICHAEL C

1894 Commercenter Drive West Ste 108

San Bernardino, CA 92408

Other Attorney

SPIWAK & IEZZA

555 Marin St Suite 140

Thousand Oaks, CA 91360

 

Court Documents

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, NA.. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $5,813.40.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, NA.. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $5,813.40.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, NA.. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $5,813.40.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, NA.. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $5,813.40.

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MOHAMMAD HARRIS BIN ASIF

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MOHAMMAD HARRIS BIN ASIF

SUPPLEMENTAL (VERIFIED) TO CLEAR PROBATE NOTES FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL (VERIFIED) TO CLEAR PROBATE NOTES FILED. (IMAGED)

HRG OF 04/10/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/10/18 - PROBATE NOTES

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA NA. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $13,861.34.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA NA. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $13,861.34.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY PRINCIPIS CAPITAL LLC. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $21,654.35.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY PRINCIPIS CAPITAL LLC. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $21,654.35.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 04/10/18 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 04/10/18 FILED.

SHAHNAZ ASIFS DECLINATION TO ACT AND NOMINATION OF MOHAMMAD HARRIS BIN ASIF FILED.

SHAHNAZ ASIFS DECLINATION TO ACT AND NOMINATION OF MOHAMMAD HARRIS BIN ASIF FILED.

PETITIONERS VERIFIED SUPPLEMENT TO CLEAR PROBATE NOTES FILED.

PETITIONERS VERIFIED SUPPLEMENT TO CLEAR PROBATE NOTES FILED.

REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE BY LISA E SPIWAK, ESQ FILED.

REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE BY LISA E SPIWAK, ESQ FILED.

NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CREDITORS FILED.

NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CREDITORS FILED.

NOTICE TO MEDI-CAL FILED BY MOHAMMAD HARRIS BIN ASIF.

NOTICE TO MEDI-CAL FILED BY MOHAMMAD HARRIS BIN ASIF.

NOTICE TO EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT FILED BY MOHAMMAD HARRIS BIN ASIF.

NOTICE TO EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT FILED BY MOHAMMAD HARRIS BIN ASIF.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY MOHAMMAD HARRIS BIN ASIF

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY MOHAMMAD HARRIS BIN ASIF

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2019
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • CASE ADDED TO COURT SUPERVISION (PROBATE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, MOHAMMAD HARRIS BIN ASIF APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, JAMES SMOTHERS APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMIN. W/ FULL AUTHORITY UNDER IAEA.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MICHAEL MADDUX PRESENT FOR MOHAMMAD ASIF.; MOHAMMAD ASIF PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 09/18/2017 OF MOHAMMAD BIN ASIF IS GRANTED; MOHAMMAD HARRIS BIN ASIF IS/ARE APPOINTED PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE: ADMINISTRATOR; IS AUTHORIZED TO ADMINISTER ESTATE UNDER IAEA WITH FUL POWERS.; NO BOND IS REQUIRED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; ACCOUNTING REVIEW SET FOR 09/16/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 09/18/2017 OF MOHAMMAD BIN ASIF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • HRG OF 07/10/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • HRG OF 07/10/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MOHAMMAD HARRIS BIN ASIF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 07/10/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL (VERIFIED) TO CLEAR PROBATE NOTES FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MOHAMMAD HARRIS BIN ASIF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY MOHAMMAD HARRIS BIN ASIF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less