This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 00:46:17 (UTC).

MOBILE HOME GROUP VS FRASER

Case Summary

On 05/17/2017 MOBILE HOME GROUP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FRASER. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3370

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOBILE HOME GROUP III, LP

Defendant

JEFFERY FRASER

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 W Orange Show Rd.

San Bernardino, CA 92408

LAW OFFICE OF JOHNE BOUZANE

474 W Orange Show Rd.

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN ATTY BIN)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN ATTY BIN); Minutes; Receipt: 170616-0447 $25.00; 170616-0447-CK Reference Number 1164976

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 05/17/2017 OF MOBILE HOME GROUP III, LP ORDERED ENTERED 06/07/17; JUDGMENT FOR: MOBILE HOME GROUP III, LP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JEFFERY FRASER, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: JEFFERY FRASER, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON JEFFERY FRASER, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON JEFFERY FRASER, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/20/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/20/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JEFFERY FRASER; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 05/20/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JEFFERY FRASER; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 05/20/17

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170518-0278 $255.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2017
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/17/2017 OF MOBILE HOME GROUP III, LP GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: MOBILE HOME GROUP III, LP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JEFFERY FRASER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,200.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $485.00 AND DAMAGES $700.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,385.00; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • 585 RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER WORKSHEET PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REQUESTED WITH COSTS OF $485.00, ATTORNEY FEES $0.00, COMMERCIAL/COVENANTS/OTHER IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE END DATE 07/05/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH LAW OFFICE OF JOHNE BOUZANE AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR MOBILE HOME GROUP III, LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/17/2017 OF MOBILE HOME GROUP III, LP AS TO JEFFERY FRASER, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON JEFFERY FRASER, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/20/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/17/2017 OF MOBILE HOME GROUP III, LP, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JEFFERY FRASER; PARTY SERVED ON 05/20/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $20.00.--BEGINNING ON 06/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,200.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170518-0278 $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.