Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 10/16/2019 at 07:44:33 (UTC).

MOBILE GROUP VS WILSON

Case Summary

On 08/15/2019 MOBILE GROUP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WILSON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4720

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP

Defendant

KENNETH WILSON

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 W Orange Show Rd.

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN ATTY BIN)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN ATTY BIN)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 08/15/2019 OF MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP ORDERED ENTERED 09/05/19; JUDGMENT FOR: MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KENNETH WILSON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: KENNETH WILSON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON KENNETH WILSON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON KENNETH WILSON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON KENNETH WILSON; PARTY SERVED ON 08/16/19 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON KENNETH WILSON; PARTY SERVED ON 08/16/19 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 08/16/19 WITH FEES OF $100.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 08/16/19 WITH FEES OF $100.00.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 190816-0201 $255.00; 190816-0201-CK Reference Number 1214074

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 190906-0365 $25.00; 190906-0365-CK Reference Number 1214897

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • PLAINTIFF PREVAILS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN ATTY BIN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 08/15/2019 OF MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP AS TO KENNETH WILSON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 08/15/2019 OF MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP ORDERED ENTERED 09/05/19; JUDGMENT FOR: MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KENNETH WILSON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: KENNETH WILSON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON KENNETH WILSON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON KENNETH WILSON; PARTY SERVED ON 08/16/19 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 08/15/2019 OF MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 08/16/19 WITH FEES OF $100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $334.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $11.15.--BEGINNING ON 07/01/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER 60 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 190816-0201 $255.00; 190816-0201-CK Reference Number 1214074

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP is a litigant