This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2022 at 04:06:07 (UTC).

MISSIONS VS AMAYA

Case Summary

On 02/25/2020 MISSIONS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against AMAYA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1199

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MISSIONS AT CHINO HILLS LP

Defendant

AMAYA, VANESSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Khalidy, Kareem M

 

Court Documents

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT -$10,000 FILED. SUMMON

Complaint

Status Conference - Unlawful Detainer

Notice

Declaration re: Reqst for Court Judgment under CCP585D Filed

* Public *

Default Previously Entered, Reqst for Court Judgmt Under CCP

* Public *

Request to Enter Default Filed

* Public *

Proof of Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint

* Public *

Money Judgment After 585 Declaration Filed

* Public *

Declaration & Order re:

* Public *

Acknowlgmt of Satisfaction of Jdmt Filed/Partially Satisfied

* Public *

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Acknowlgmt of Satisfaction of Jdmt Filed/Partially Satisfied; Comments: PARTIALLY SATISFIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketFile Type: Document Received; Comments: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketFile Type: Plaintiff Prevails

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Money Judgment After 585 Declaration Filed; Filed By: MISSIONS AT CHINO HILLS LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration & Order re:; Filed By: MISSIONS AT CHINO HILLS LP; Comments: LOST ORIGINAL LEASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration re: Reqst for Court Judgment under CCP585D Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketFile Type: Document Received; Comments: 585

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request to Enter Default Filed; Filed By: MISSIONS AT CHINO HILLS LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Default Previously Entered, Reqst for Court Judgmt Under CCP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed By: MISSIONS AT CHINO HILLS LP; Comments: Filed with Costs $25.70

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2020
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Complaint; Type: Action; Description: 2/25/2020 - 0001 - UDLUD Complaint <$10,000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $255.00; Payment: $255.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $255.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: 20200225-0681

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $255.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comments: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration of Daily Rental Value Filed-Daily Rental Value; Comments: DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $79.66.--BEGINNING ON 03/01/20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Status Conference - Unlawful Detainer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketFile Type: Past Due Rent is:; Comments: PAST DUE RENT IS $2,390.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Unlawful Detainer Complaint of <$10,000 Filed; Comments: UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. 200225-0681-CK CUE/ 255.00 PAYMT 200225-0681-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 572458

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketFile Type: Case Assigned for All Purposes; Comments: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less