This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 19:03:24 (UTC).

MISSION VS REYES

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 MISSION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against REYES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7662

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MISSON FURNITURE HOME CENTER

Defendant

ANDREW REYES

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0337 $100.00; 171004-0337-CK Reference Number 15927

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ANDREW REYES. PARTY SERVED ON 11/07/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $30.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ANDREW REYES. PARTY SERVED ON 11/07/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $30.00. (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MISSON FURNITURE HOME CENTER FOR WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 180710-0053 $25.00; 180710-0053-CK Reference Number 17349

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SENT IN SASE ) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $44.83 (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • WRIT/MEMO RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 12/20/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF MISSON FURNITURE HOME CENTER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:19; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: COURTNE DOUGHERTY; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; MISSON FURNITURE HOME CENTER REPRESENTED BY VANESSA MORALES.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ANDREW REYES; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; ANDREW REYES HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; VANESSA MORALES IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST ANDREW REYES.; JUDGMENT FOR: MISSON FURNITURE HOME CENTER; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ANDREW REYES; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $388.32 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $60.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $448.32; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ANDREW REYES. PARTY SERVED ON 11/07/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $30.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0337 $100.00; 171004-0337-CK Reference Number 15927

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less