This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 19:03:47 (UTC).

MISSION VS HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 MISSION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7664

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER

Defendant

DANIEL HERNANDEZ

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0354 $100.00; 171004-0354-CK Reference Number 15979

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO DANIEL HERNANDEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 10/11/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $30.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO DANIEL HERNANDEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 10/11/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $30.00. (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2018
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 180711-0858 $25.00; 180711-0858-CK Reference Number 17365

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( MAILED IN SASE ) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • WRIT/MEMO RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $83.07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 05/22/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:52; JAY H ROBINSON, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; COURT ATTENDANT T MEJIA; APPEARANCES:; MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER REPRESENTED BY VANESSA MORALES.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: DANIEL HERNANDEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; DANIEL HERNANDEZ HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; VANESSA MORALES IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST DANIEL HERNANDEZ.; JUDGMENT FOR: MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DANIEL HERNANDEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $770.74 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $60.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $830.74; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; NOT REPORTED; JAY H ROBINSON, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; COURT ATTENDANT CUAUHTEMOC NUNEZ; APPEARANCES:; MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER REPRESENTED BY VANESSA MORALES.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: DANIEL HERNANDEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: SETTLEMENT; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/09/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F6.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY PLAINTIFF.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JAY H ROBINSON, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER REPRESENTED BY VANESSA MORALES.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: DANIEL HERNANDEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: NONE GIVEN; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/04/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F6.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY PLAINTIFF.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: COURTNE DOUGHERTY; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER REPRESENTED BY VANESSA MORALES.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: DANIEL HERNANDEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: NONE GIVEN; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/21/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F6.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO DANIEL HERNANDEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 10/11/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $30.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0354 $100.00; 171004-0354-CK Reference Number 15979

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less