This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 18:17:08 (UTC).

MISSION VS CAMPUZANO

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 MISSION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CAMPUZANO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7478

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER

Defendant

YESENIA CAMPUZANO

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0260 $100.00

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER FILED.

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED.

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO YESENIA CAMPUZANO. PARTY SERVED ON 09/28/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $30.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO YESENIA CAMPUZANO. PARTY SERVED ON 09/28/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $30.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:26; TONY RAPHAEL, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER REPRESENTED BY VANESSA MORALES.; DEFENDANT YESENIA CAMPUZANO PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; AUTHORIZATION FILED.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS SETTLED.; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT FOR: MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER; JUDGMENT AGAINST: YESENIA CAMPUZANO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,076.72 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,076.72; MONEY JUDGMENT SHALL BE PAID AT THE RATE OF $70.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 12/22/17. EACH PAYMENT THEREAFTER SHALL BE DUE ON THE 22ND DAY OF EACH FOLLOWING MONTH.; IF THE DEFENDANT SHOULD DEFAULT ON ANY TERMS OF THIS AGREEMENT, THE ENTIRE JUDGMENT SHALL BECOME IMMEDIATELY DUE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); 10:27; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 12/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:26; TONY RAPHAEL, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER REPRESENTED BY VANESSA MORALES.; DEFENDANT YESENIA CAMPUZANO PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; AUTHORIZATION FILED.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS SETTLED.; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT FOR: MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER; JUDGMENT AGAINST: YESENIA CAMPUZANO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,076.72 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,076.72; MONEY JUDGMENT SHALL BE PAID AT THE RATE OF $70.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 12/22/17. EACH PAYMENT THEREAFTER SHALL BE DUE ON THE 22ND DAY OF EACH FOLLOWING MONTH.; IF THE DEFENDANT SHOULD DEFAULT ON ANY TERMS OF THIS AGREEMENT, THE ENTIRE JUDGMENT SHALL BECOME IMMEDIATELY DUE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); 10:27; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO YESENIA CAMPUZANO. PARTY SERVED ON 09/28/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0260 $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less