This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/05/2018 at 21:27:53 (UTC).

MISSION FURNITURE V. NEGREROS

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 MISSION FURNITURE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NEGREROS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1066

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER

Defendant

JUAN M NEGREROS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2013
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $54.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2011
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN COUNTER P/U BIN ); Minutes; Receipt: 111011-1933 $25.00; 111011-1933-CK Reference Number 2620

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 08/24/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2011
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2011
  • STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; CHARLES M FUERTSCH, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: F NIETO; APPEARANCES:; MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER REPRESENTED BY FANELLY MILLAN.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JUAN M NEGREROS; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM FILED.; JUAN M NEGREROS NOT HAVING APPEARED, THIS MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; 01:54; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; FANELLY MILLAN IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST JUAN M NEGREROS.; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER HAVE &; RECOVER FROM JUAN M NEGREROS:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,131.52 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $110.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,241.52; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF CLAIM FILED AS TO JUAN M NEGREROS. PARTY SERVED ON 07/08/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTE. WITH FEES OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; STEPHANIE THORNTON-HARRIS, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: M SIEDLE; APPEARANCES:; MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER REPRESENTED BY FANELLY MILLAN.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JUAN M NEGREROS; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF (FOR SERVICE).; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/17/11 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT F2R.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF MISSION FURNITURE HOME CENTER FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JUAN M NEGREROS. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EACH DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 110505-2501 $110.00; 110505-2501-EZ Reference Number 118324

    Read MoreRead Less