Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 19:26:45 (UTC).

MIROS -V- MEDINA

Case Summary

On 03/23/2017 MIROS filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against MEDINA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2001

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIROS ENTERPRISES,LLC

Defendants

ABEL MEDINA

SILVIA MEDINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEECH, D. WAYNE

11001 E V Alley Mall Suite 200

El Monte, CA 91731

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN MOLINA

Po Box 121

Corona, CA 92878

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (LODGED) FILED.

STIPULATION RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (LODGED) FILED.

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:25 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:25 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: M HOUSTON; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY D WAYNE LEECH PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; MIROS ENTERPRISES,LLC REPRESENTED BY LUZ VELEZ-GARCIA.; ATTORNEY JOHN MOLINA PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; DEFENDANT ABEL MEDINA, SILVIA MEDINA PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:16; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; JUDGMENT TO ENTER UPON DEFAULT.; HEARINGS:; OSC RE: DISMISSAL FILED BY MIROS ENTERPRISES,LLC IS SET FOR 06/06/17AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT F7.; 09:20; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:25 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:25 HOURS.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ANSWER FILED BY ABEL MEDINA, SILVIA MEDINA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF JOHNMOLINA.

ANSWER FILED BY ABEL MEDINA, SILVIA MEDINA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF JOHNMOLINA.; Minutes; Receipt: 170329-0182 $480.00; 170329-0182-VS Reference Number 031-0010737242

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170323-0507 $255.00; 170323-0507-CK Reference Number 1072

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2017
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL FILED BY MIROS ENTERPRISES,LLC; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MIROS ENTERPRISES,LLC, ABEL MEDINA, SILVIA MEDINA; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:22; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCES / PURSUANT TO STIPULATION.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); 09:22; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ABEL MEDINA FOR COPY; Minutes; Receipt: 170426-0451 $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (LODGED) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:25 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: M HOUSTON; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY D WAYNE LEECH PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; MIROS ENTERPRISES,LLC REPRESENTED BY LUZ VELEZ-GARCIA.; ATTORNEY JOHN MOLINA PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; DEFENDANT ABEL MEDINA, SILVIA MEDINA PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:16; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; JUDGMENT TO ENTER UPON DEFAULT.; HEARINGS:; OSC RE: DISMISSAL FILED BY MIROS ENTERPRISES,LLC IS SET FOR 06/06/17AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT F7.; 09:20; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:25 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • PROOFS OF SERVICE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NEED ORIGINAL SIGNATURES .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ABEL MEDINA, SILVIA MEDINA FOR FAX; Minutes; Receipt: 170329-0191 $6.00; 170329-0191-VS Reference Number 031-0010737242

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY ABEL MEDINA, SILVIA MEDINA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF JOHNMOLINA.; Minutes; Receipt: 170329-0182 $480.00; 170329-0182-VS Reference Number 031-0010737242

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • ANSWER AND POS BY FAX RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $44.60.--BEGINNING ON 03/13/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,195.92

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MIROS ENTERPRISES,LLC FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 170323-0579 $16.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170323-0507 $255.00; 170323-0507-CK Reference Number 1072

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEECH DARYL WAYNE