This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/13/2018 at 06:33:08 (UTC).

MIRANDA HORTA-V-DAVID BRIGDON,ETAL

Case Summary

On 03/10/2010 MIRANDA HORTA-V-DAVID BRIGDON,ETAL was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0149

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Minor

MIRANDA HORTA

Defendants

DAVID BRIGDON

LAVERNE BRIGDON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorney

CHOLODENKO, MICHAEL A

Defendant Attorney

BONNIE R. MOSS & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/12/2011

OSC RE: CONFIRMATION OF STATUS/SETTLEMENT FILED BY DAVID BRIGDON; Disposition: VACATED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2010

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2010

VACATE OSCXX HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/12/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B3.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2010

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KIRTLAND L MAHLUM, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: BECKY GENOVESI; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; BAILIFF: J HALTERMAN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY GREGORY TICH APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MIRANDA HORTA.; ATTORNEY MARGARET WARNER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR DAVID BRIGDON, LAVERNE BRIGDON.; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; COUNSEL STIPULATES TO THE COURT COMMISSIONER BY COURT CALL.; PARTIES INDICATE TO THE COURT THAT THE CASE HAS SETTLED.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : CONFIRMATION OF STATUS/SETTLEMENT SET FOR 01/12/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B3.; APPEARANCE IS MANDATORY UNLESS PROPER DOCUMENTS ARE FILED 5 COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2010

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY DAVID BRIGDON, LAVERNE BRIGDON.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2010

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; CHERYL C KERSEY PRESIDING.; CLERK: APRIL MARCUM; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; BAILIFF: T JOHNSTON; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY GREGORY TICH APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MIRANDA HORTA.; ATTORNEY MARGARET WARNER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR DAVID BRIGDON, LAVERNE BRIGDON.; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR CASE MANANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/03/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B3.; ACTION - COMPLETE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2010

0RDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SERVICE FILED BY MIRANDA HORTA.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; CHERYL C KERSEY PRESIDING.; CLERK: APRIL MARCUM; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; BAILIFF: T JOHNSTON; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY GREGORY TICH APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MIRANDA HORTA.; ATTORNEY MARGARET WARNER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR DAVID BRIGDON, LAVERNE BRIGDON.; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SERVICE.; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COURT FINDS:; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: SERVICE HAS BEEN COMPLETED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/23/2010

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY MIRANDA HORTA.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2010

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY DAVID BRIGDON, LAVERNE BRIGDON.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2010

STIPULATION RE: TO PROCEED AGAINST ESTATE FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
06/08/2010

0RDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SERVICE FILED BY MIRANDA HORTA.; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; KIRTLAND L MAHLUM PRESIDING.; CLERK: APRIL MARCUM; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; BAILIFF: J HALTERMAN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MICHAEL CHOLODENKO APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MIRANDA HORTA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: DAVID BRIGDON, LAVERNE BRIGDON; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR OSC RE SERVICE COMPLETION.; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/28/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B3.; APPEARANCE IS MANDATORY UNLESS PROOF OF SERVICE IS FILED 5 COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY ATTORNEY MICHAEL CHOLODENKO.; ACTION - COMPLETE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2010

VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/08/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B3.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2010

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT FILED AS TO DAVID BRIGDON. PARTY SERVED ON 04/11/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $9.90.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2010

ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 03/10/2010 OF MIRANDA HORTA FOR MIRANDA HORTA, ATTORNEY MICHAEL A CHOLODENKO ADDED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2010

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 03/10/2010 OF MIRANDA HORTA - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2010

ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 03/10/2010 OF MIRANDA HORTA FOR MIRANDA HORTA ADD LANA HORTA AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2010

NO SUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2010

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2010

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 100310-3219 $355.00; 100310-3219-CK Reference Number 31136

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2010

CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B3

[+] Read More [-] Read Less