This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 05/18/2020 at 18:48:21 (UTC).

MILTON-V- DESERT SANDS

Case Summary

On 08/13/2018 MILTON-V- DESERT SANDS was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1125

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOVING MILTON

Defendants

ANTELOPE SCHOOL DISTRICT

THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

DESERT SANDS CHARTER HIGH SCHOOL

THE CITY OF RIALTO

ANTHONY NEWMAN

LIFELONG LEARNING ADMINISTRATION

DESERT SANDS PUBLIC CHARTER, INC.

OPSEC SPECIALIZED PROTECTION, INC.

VISTA NORTE PUBLICCHARTER SCHOOL

Cross Plaintiffs

DESERT SANDS PUBLIC CHARTER INC

LIFELONG LEARNING ADMINISTRATION CORPORATIO

OPEC SPECIALIZED PROTECTION, INC.

Cross Defendants

OPSEC SPECIALIZED PROTECTION INC

MOES 1-500

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOWNTOWN L.A LAW GROUP

3460 Wilshire Blvd Ste 950

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MERLIN LAW GROUP

2049 Century Park East Suite 650

Los Angeles, CA 90067

BLANK ROME LLP

2029 Century Park East 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

KRAMER, DEBOER & KEANE

21860 Burbank Boulevard Suite 370

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

SELLAR HAZARD & LUCIA

201 North Civic Suite 145

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

 

Court Documents

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF LOVING MILTON

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF LOVING MILTON

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

DECLARATION OF KYLE B BOONE ISO MOTION FILED

DECLARATION OF KYLE B BOONE ISO MOTION FILED

DECLARATION OF DUSTIN Z MOAVEN ISO MOTION FILED

DECLARATION OF DUSTIN Z MOAVEN ISO MOTION FILED

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO VISTA NORTE PUBLICCHARTER SCHOOL, LIFELONG LEARNING ADMINISTRATION, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO VISTA NORTE PUBLICCHARTER SCHOOL, LIFELONG LEARNING ADMINISTRATION, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

AMENDED NTC OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS FILED.

AMENDED NTC OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS FILED.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS DOWNTOWN L.A LAW GROUP FOR COUNSEL REPRESENTING LOVING MILTON FILED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS DOWNTOWN L.A LAW GROUP FOR COUNSEL REPRESENTING LOVING MILTON FILED

ANSWER FILED BY ANTHONY NEWMAN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MERLIN LAW GROUP.

ANSWER FILED BY ANTHONY NEWMAN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MERLIN LAW GROUP.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ANTHONY NEWMAN SERVED ON 02/17/19 WITH FEES OF $190.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ANTHONY NEWMAN SERVED ON 02/17/19 WITH FEES OF $190.00.

NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY DESERT SANDS PUBLICCHARTER, INC..

NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY DESERT SANDS PUBLICCHARTER, INC..

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY OPSEC SPECIALIZED PROTECTION, INC..

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY OPSEC SPECIALIZED PROTECTION, INC..

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF LOVING MILTON BY DESERT SANDS PUBLICCHARTER, INC., LIFELONG LEARNING ADMINISTRATION

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF LOVING MILTON BY DESERT SANDS PUBLICCHARTER, INC., LIFELONG LEARNING ADMINISTRATION

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF LOVING MILTON BY OPSEC SPECIALIZED PROTECTION, INC.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF LOVING MILTON BY OPSEC SPECIALIZED PROTECTION, INC.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • HearingDept: S27; Action text: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketJURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • HearingDept: S27; Action text: READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketREADINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • HearingDept: S27; Action text: MOTION RE: ORDR REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT A MENTAL EXAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • HearingDept: S27; Action text: MOTION RE: JOINDER TO MOTION FOR ORDER FOR MENTAL EXAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketMOTION RE: JOINDER TO MOTION FOR ORDER FOR MENTAL EXAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketMOTION RE: ORDR REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT A MENTAL EXAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • HearingDept: S27; Action text: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketJURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 08/13/2018 OF LOVING MILTON, ANTELOPE SCHOOL DISTRICT REMOVED AS A PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 08/13/2018 OF LOVING MILTON, DESERT SANDS PUBLICCHARTER, INC., VISTA NORTE PUBLICCHARTER SCHOOL, LIFELONG LEARNING ADMINISTRATION, OPSEC SPECIALIZED PROTECTION, INC., ANTHONY NEWMAN IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID BY LOVING MILTON FOR 1ST APPEARANCE; ; Minutes; Receipt: 180813-0871 $435.00 ; 180813-0871-CK Reference Number CK 1132

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF LOVING MILTON FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.