This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 10:48:16 (UTC).

MILTON HARPER -V- C.R. ENGLAND, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 MILTON HARPER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against C R ENGLAND, INC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1256

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MILTON HARPER, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF

JONATHAN MITCHELL

RONNIE STEVENSON

Defendant

C.R. ENGLAND, INC., A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLUMENTHAL, NORDREHAUG & BHOWMIK

2255 Calle Clara

La Jolla, CA 92037

Defendant Attorney

THEODORA ORINGHER PC

535 Anton Boulevard Ninth Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-7109

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2016
  • STIP/ORDER TO CONTINUE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CASE WAS DISMISSED AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE WAS DEN IED AT THE 11/22 HRG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; VICTORIA RIVAPALACIO APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MILTON HARPER, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF, RONNIE STEVENSON, JONATHAN MITCHELL.; WALTER PENA APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR C.R. ENGLAND, INC.,A CORPORATION.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO CONTINUE THIS MATTER PENDING FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT IN FEDERAL; COURT IS DENIED. THE COURT FINDS NO REASON TO KEEP THE STATE ACTION ACTIVE IF SETTLEMENT HAS; BEEN REACHED IN FEDERAL COURT.; THE COURT RESERVES JURISDICTION TO REACTIVATE THE MATTER IF REMANDED BACK TO STATE COURT.; ON THE COURTS OWN MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • FILE ROUTED TO S30 FOR 11/22 HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • VACATE TSCCV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/30/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • NOTICE OF A HEARING FOR STATUS OF REMOVAL SENT.; Minutes; A HEARING FOR STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR 11-22-16 AT 8:30AM; IN DEPT S30 OF THE SAN BERNARDINO JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF MILTON HARPER, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF FOR C.R. ENGLAND, INC.,A CORPORATION, ATTORNEY THEODORA ORINGHER PC ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY C.R. ENGLAND, INC.,A CORPORATION. FEDERAL NUMBER 2:16-CV-06354.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JOHN M PACHECO, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; NOCHOLAS DEBLOUW APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MILTON HARPER, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF, RONNIE STEVENSON, JONATHAN MITCHELL.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; COUNSEL ANTICIPATES THAT SERVICE OF THE SUMMONS AND SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WILL TAKE PLACE ON; AUGUST 8TH; IN ADDITION, THE PARTIES HAVE AGREED TO ATTEND EARLY MEDIATION, WHICH IS CURRENTLY SET; FOR MID AUGUST.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/30/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2016
  • MOTION RE: FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 07/05/16, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MILTON HARPER, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF, RONNIE STEVENSON, JONATHAN MITCHELL (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF MILTON HARPER, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF, RONNIE STEVENSON, JONATHAN MITCHELL IS ADDED AS A PLAINTIFFS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF MILTON HARPER, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MILTON HARPER, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF FOR FIRST PAPER FEE, COMPLEX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160201-0763 $1,435.00; 160201-0763-CK Reference Number #813

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less