This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:34:05 (UTC).

MILLER -V- AVITIA

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 MILLER -V- AVITIA was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1538

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORDELIA MILLER

Defendants

GABRIEL AVITIA

MARIA LOPEZ DE AVITIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASSOCIATES, LAW OFFICES OF RIPLEY &

14440 Civic Drive Bldg A

Victorville, CA 92392

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

633 West 5Th Street Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ANSWER FILED BY MARIA LOPEZ DE AVITIA, GABRIEL AVITIA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH.

ANSWER FILED BY MARIA LOPEZ DE AVITIA, GABRIEL AVITIA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO MARIA LOPEZ DE AVITIA SERVED ON 11/20/17 WITH FEES OF $105.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO MARIA LOPEZ DE AVITIA SERVED ON 11/20/17 WITH FEES OF $105.00.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANACE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED BY CORDELIA MILLER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS(DEF CNSL FTA)/ FURTHER TSC; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; (CLERKS CALENDAR-JUDGE SACHS AWAY); THOMAS S. GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY HOTCHKISS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JOSHUA MOODY PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY JIMMY SWINDER PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; DEFENSE COUNSEL STATES HIS PREVIOUS FAILURE TO APPEAR WAS A RESULT OF A CALENDARING ISSUE; WITHIN HIS OFFICE.; TSC CONTINUED AS FOLLOWS:; HEARINGS:; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 09/11/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S28; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • NOTICE OF OSC RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR FILED BY CORDELIA MILLER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL A SACHS, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY HOTCHKISS; COURT REPORTER KIMBERLY MORROW 9396; COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JOSHUA MOODY PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH FOR MARIA LOPEZ DE AVITIA, GABRIEL AVITIA NOT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL ADVISES THE COURT WRITTEN DISCOVERY IS STILL OUTSTANDING.; THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENSE COUNSEL, COURT SETS MATTER FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; REGARDING SANCTIONS. SANCTIONS IF IMPOSED MAY INCLUDE $150 MADE PAYABLE TO SAN BERNARDINO; SUPERIOR COURT. COUNSEL MAY FILE SATISFACTORY DECLARATION WITH THE COURT FOR HIS/HER FAILURE; TO APPEAR PRIOR TO THIS HEARING FOR COURTS REVIEW.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : SANCTIONS(DEF CNSL FTA)/ FURTHER TSC SET FOR 07/11/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S28.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARIA LOPEZ DE AVITIA, GABRIEL AVITIA FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 180221-0766 $870.00; 180221-0766-CK Reference Number CK#124383

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY MARIA LOPEZ DE AVITIA, GABRIEL AVITIA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO MARIA LOPEZ DE AVITIA SERVED ON 11/20/17 WITH FEES OF $105.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): COURT REQUIRES ORIGINAL SIGNED DOCUMENT OR INDICATE IT IS A FAX COPY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CORDELIA MILLER FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171101-0732 $435.00; 171101-0732-CK Reference Number 16733

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less