This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 03:30:56 (UTC).

MILDRED AMELIA NELMS

Case Summary

On 12/12/2016 MILDRED AMELIA NELMS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1228

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PAULETTE GRIMES

Decedent

MILDRED AMELIA NELMS

Not Classified By Court

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FULLERTON LEMANN SCHAEFER & DOMINICK

215 North D Street Suite 100

San Bernardino, CA 92401-1712

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

HRG OF 02/16/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/16/17 - PROBATE NOTES

PROOF OF HOLOGRAPHIC WILL FILED.

PROOF OF HOLOGRAPHIC WILL FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 10/17/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 10/17/17 FILED.

HRG OF 10/17/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 10/17/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE TO FILE OR PRESENT CLAIM FILED.

NOTICE TO FILE OR PRESENT CLAIM FILED.

LETTERS ISSUED ( TESTAMENTARY)

LETTERS ISSUED ( TESTAMENTARY)

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY PAULETTE GRIMES

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY PAULETTE GRIMES

RECEIPT RE: FEES , THOMAS W DOMINICK FILED.

RECEIPT RE: FEES , THOMAS W DOMINICK FILED.

RECEIPT RE: DISTRIBUTIVE SHARE, SHELBY PAUL POOR FILED.

RECEIPT RE: DISTRIBUTIVE SHARE, SHELBY PAUL POOR FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS FILED BY PAULETTE GRIMES

PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS FILED BY PAULETTE GRIMES

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR, PAULETTE GRIMES APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND $60,000.00, B.M. GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR, PAULETTE GRIMES APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND $60,000.00, B.M. GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY PAULETTE GRIMES

FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY PAULETTE GRIMES

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.; Minutes; ACTION - COMPLETE; CASE CLOSED.

RECEIPT RE: DISTRIBUTIVE SHARE , NANCY L. HASTREITER FILED.

RECEIPT RE: DISTRIBUTIVE SHARE , NANCY L. HASTREITER FILED.

ORDER SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR FILED.

ORDER SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR FILED.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2018
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.; Minutes; ACTION - COMPLETE; CASE CLOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: DISTRIBUTIVE SHARE , NANCY L. HASTREITER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: DISTRIBUTIVE SHARE, PAULETTE GRIMES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: DISTRIBUTIVE SHARE, SHELBY PAUL POOR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: FEES , THOMAS W DOMINICK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF PAULETTE GRIMES AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: TRACY MORRIS; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY THOMAS W. DOMINICK PRESENT FOR PAULETTE GRIMES.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING APPROVED/GRANTED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE SET FOR 10/23/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY PAULETTE GRIMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY PAULETTE GRIMES FOR PETITION AND COURT REPORTER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 161212-0193 $465.00; 161212-0193-CK Reference Number #72591

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PAULETTE GRIMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON PETITION FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.