This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/26/2018 at 11:11:02 (UTC).

MIELKE -V- JAMES RE MGMT

Case Summary

On 01/08/2010 MIELKE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JAMES RE MGMT. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0245

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEGGY MIELKE

Defendants and Cross Defendants

PACIFIC CENTURY INVESTMENT, INC

JAMES REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC

YSM INVESTMENT NO.1, LLC

Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

HO'S REMODEL CORPORATION

JAMES REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, INC

BELVEDERE PLUMBINGCOMPANY

JAMES REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID H RICKS & ASSOCIATES

8600 Utica Avenue Suite 200

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

CIHIGOYENETCHE GROSSBERG & CLOUSE

8038 Haven Ave Suite E

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

RYAN MERCALDO & WORTHINGTON LLP

3636 Nobel Drive Ste 200

San Diego, CA 92122

CIHIGOYENETCHE GROSSBERG & CLOUSE

8038 Haven Ave Suite E

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

FREEBURG & NETTELS

600 South Lake Avenue Suite 500

Pasadena, CA 91106-3907

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2013
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 023-0149381702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • FILING FEE PAID BY HO'S REMODEL CORPORATION FOR FAX FILING (7 PAGES); Minutes; Receipt: 130103-2791 $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THE X-DEFT WAS DISMISSED FROM CASE -.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • FILING FEE PAID BY HO'S REMODEL CORPORATION FOR FAX FILING (7 PAGES); Minutes; Receipt: 130103-2538 $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 023-0149372052

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): HO;S REMODEL WAS DISMISSED FROM THE CASE -.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • $150.00 JURY FEES FORFEITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; CLERK: CHRISTINA L. BANDFIELD; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT C SHELBY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DAVID RICKS PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY KATHERINE SPANIAC PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT JAMES REAL ESTATE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL REPRESENTS THE ENTIRE CASE SHOULD BE DISMISSED AS DISMISSAL HAVE BEEN FILED.; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: CASE DISMISSED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY JAMES REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2010
  • NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF GENERAL AND SPECIFIC FILED BY JAMES REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2010
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY JAMES REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2010
  • ANSWER FILED BY JAMES REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY CIHIGOYENETCHE GROSSBERG & CLOUSE.; Minutes; Receipt: 100303-2550 $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2010
  • VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/09/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED AS TO JAMES REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC. PARTY SERVED ON 02/01/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2010
  • PROOF IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DEFENDANTS NAME MUST MATCH EXACTLY. INCLUDE *DBA* ON DOCUMENT WHEN FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2010
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 100113-2568 $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R10

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.