This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 04:02:29 (UTC).

MIDLAND -V- HARRISON

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 MIDLAND -V- HARRISON was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8001

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF

Defendant

ARNOLD HARRISON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONALCORPORATION

110 E. Wilshire Ave Ste 212

Fullerton, CA 92832

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ARNOLD HARRISON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/06/17 WITH COSTS OF $125.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ARNOLD HARRISON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/06/17 WITH COSTS OF $125.00 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/15/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ARNOLD HARRISON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/06/17 WITH COSTS OF $125.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PLAINTIFF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $10,067.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0406 $380.00; 170918-0406-CK Reference Number 0757580

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less