This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:03:57 (UTC).

MIDLAND-V-COOKE

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 MIDLAND-V-COOKE was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7774

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

WANDA K COOKE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILED

ORDER ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

STIPULATION RE: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FILED.

STIPULATION RE: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF.; DEFENDANT WANDA K COOKE PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:43; TRIAL REQUESTED.; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 1 HOUR; JURY WAIVED; CASE TO PROCEED AS TO NON-JURY TRIAL.; TRIAL SETTING ORDERS ISSUED.; "REQUIREMENTS OF TRIAL" HANDED TO ALL PARTIES; BENCH TRIAL: ORDER: EACH SIDE IS ORDERED TO FILE WITH THE COURT AND EXCHANGE WITH OPPOSING; PARTIES, THE FOLLOWING: [1] TRIAL BRIEF, [2] WITNESS LIST, AND [3] EXHIBIT LIST, PROPERLY; PAGE-NUMBERED, TABBED AND INDEXED, PURSUANT TO PARAGRAPHS (C )(F) OF CRC 3.1110, 10 DAYS PRIOR; TO TRIAL. ANY CCP 98 DECLARATION MUST BE SERVED AT LEAST 30 DAYS PRIOR TO TRIAL AND IN; COMPLIANCE WITH THAT STATUE. VIOLATION OF THIS ORDER MAY RESULT IN MONETARY SANCTIONS,; EXCLUSION OF EVIDENCE AND/OR WITNESSES.; HEARINGS:; COURT TRIAL ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/14/2017 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC IS SET FOR 06/07/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S17; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:45; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON WANDA K COOKE; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/28/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON WANDA K COOKE; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/28/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF GENERAL DENIAL BY MAIL ON 11/08/17 AS TO HUNT AND HENRIQUES, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF GENERAL DENIAL BY MAIL ON 11/08/17 AS TO HUNT AND HENRIQUES, FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE OF COURT TRIAL FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC.

NOTICE OF COURT TRIAL FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/14/2017 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FOR STIP/ORD FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 180216-0237 $20.00; 180216-0237-CK Reference Number 777337

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PLAINTIFF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,368.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170915-0239 $196.00; 170915-0239-CK Reference Number 733321

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less