This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 04:42:31 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING VS HERRERA

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HERRERA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8188

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

TANYA K HERRERA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES, ATTORNEYS ATLAW

151 Bernal Rd. Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO TANYA K HERRERA SERVED ON 11/13/17 WITH FEES OF $59.50.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO TANYA K HERRERA SERVED ON 11/13/17 WITH FEES OF $59.50.

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO TANYA K HERRERA WITH COSTS OF $59.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO TANYA K HERRERA WITH COSTS OF $59.50

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FOR WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 180427-0414 $25.00; 180427-0414-CK Reference Number 794150

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( 5976.02 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 180423-0543 $25.00; 180423-0543-CK Reference Number 792335

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ORDERED ENTERED 04/03/18; JUDGMENT FOR: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: TANYA K HERRERA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,651.52 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $299.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5,951.02; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON TANYA K HERRERA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO TANYA K HERRERA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUD FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: INTEREST/ CCP 1033/ ATTY FEES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2017
  • CASE NUMBER CHANGED FROM CIV/DS17118188

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PLAINTIFF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,651.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FOR NEW FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0998 $240.00; 170918-0998-CK Reference Number 733333

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less