This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 04:52:33 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING -V- NUNO

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NUNO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1283

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

VANESSA NUNO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES, ATTORNEYS ATLAW

151 Bernal Rd. Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION RE: INTEREST; COSTS CCP 1033; ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

DECLARATION RE: INTEREST; COSTS CCP 1033; ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $40.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $40.00.

DECLARATION RE: 1788.60(B) IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

DECLARATION RE: 1788.60(B) IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT (IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,324.22) FILED.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT (IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,324.22) FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON VANESSA NUNO.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON VANESSA NUNO.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO VANESSA NUNO WITH COSTS OF $57.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO VANESSA NUNO WITH COSTS OF $57.50

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON VANESSA NUNO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/04/17 WITH COSTS OF $57.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON VANESSA NUNO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/04/17 WITH COSTS OF $57.50 FILED.

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ORDERED ENTERED 09/14/17; JUDGMENT FOR: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VANESSA NUNO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,047.66 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $297.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,345.16; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENTS SENT.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENTS SENT.; Minutes; CHECK #793620 AND WRIT OF EXECUTION ARE RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: PLEASE RETURN THE; ORIGINAL WRIT TO THE COURT FOR CANCELLATION SO THE NEW WRIT MAY BE ISSUED.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 180629-0749 $25.00; 180629-0749-CK Reference Number 793620

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 1349.22 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENTS SENT.; Minutes; CHECK #793620 AND WRIT OF EXECUTION ARE RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: PLEASE RETURN THE; ORIGINAL WRIT TO THE COURT FOR CANCELLATION SO THE NEW WRIT MAY BE ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ONLY ONE WRIT PER COUNTY EVERY SIX MONTHS PLEASE WAIT UNTIL WRIT EXPIRES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT (IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,324.22) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( $2,370.16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 171214-0637 $25.00; 171214-0637-CK Reference Number 758037

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/26/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON VANESSA NUNO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/04/17 WITH COSTS OF $57.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO VANESSA NUNO WITH COSTS OF $57.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161216-0064 $240.00; 161216-0064-CK Reference Number 660580

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.