This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 06:14:28 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING -V- MONTERO

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MONTERO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1769

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

FERNANDO MONTERO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON FERNANDO MONTERO.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON FERNANDO MONTERO.

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ORDERED ENTERED 03/30/17; JUDGMENT FOR: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: FERNANDO MONTERO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,754.75 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $297.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,052.25; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION OF 1788.60(B) FILED

DECLARATION OF 1788.60(B) FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FERNANDO MONTERO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $57.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FERNANDO MONTERO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $57.50 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2017
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 170424-0352 $25.00; 170424-0352-CK Reference Number 699010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ORDERED ENTERED 03/30/17; JUDGMENT FOR: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: FERNANDO MONTERO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,754.75 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $297.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,052.25; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF 1788.60(B) FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON FERNANDO MONTERO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO FERNANDO MONTERO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/22/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FERNANDO MONTERO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $57.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PLAINTIFF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 161221-0540 $240.00; 161221-0540-CK Reference Number 662666

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.